This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/09/2018 at 14:11:48 (UTC).

ANA DIAZ -V- BARSTOW 3465

Case Summary

On 10/03/2016 ANA DIAZ filed an Other lawsuit against BARSTOW 3465. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********6451

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ANA DIAZ

Defendants

BARSTOW 3465, INC

GILBERTO ARAMBURO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

THE METTIAS LAW FIRM APLC

15500 West Sand Street Ste 1

Victorville, CA 92392

KINER LEGAL GROUP

14318 California Group Suite 210

Victorville, CA 92392

Defendant Attorney

MORRIS POLICH & PURDY

1055 W Seventh St 24Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF KINER LEGAL GROUP FOR ANA DIAZ CHANGES ITS NAME TO KINER LEGAL GROUP FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF KINER LEGAL GROUP FOR ANA DIAZ CHANGES ITS NAME TO KINER LEGAL GROUP FILED

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING METTIAS & KINER LEGAL GROUP, APLC WITH KINER LEGAL GROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ANA DIAZ.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING METTIAS & KINER LEGAL GROUP, APLC WITH KINER LEGAL GROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ANA DIAZ.

DECLARATION OF JAMES H DEMERJIAN IN SPPRT OF REQ FOR SANCT FILED

DECLARATION OF JAMES H DEMERJIAN IN SPPRT OF REQ FOR SANCT FILED

NOTICE NEW FILED BY GILBERTO ARAMBURO, BARSTOW 3465, INC.

NOTICE NEW FILED BY GILBERTO ARAMBURO, BARSTOW 3465, INC.

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE:STATUS OF ARBITRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE:STATUS OF ARBITRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON OSC RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION FILED.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF THE METTIAS LAW FIRM APLC FOR ANA DIAZ CHANGES ITS NAME TO METTIAS & KINER LEGAL GROUP, APLC FILED

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF THE METTIAS LAW FIRM APLC FOR ANA DIAZ CHANGES ITS NAME TO METTIAS & KINER LEGAL GROUP, APLC FILED

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO VACATE AND CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO VACATE AND CONTINUE TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE FILED.; Minutes; VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/14/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 09/12/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S30

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION FILED

ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION FILED

STIPULATION RE: FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION FILED.

STIPULATION RE: FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION FILED.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.

NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; STIPULATION/ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION AND CHECK #111124 ($435.00) ARE; RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): BARSTOW 3465, INC. MUST BE NAMED AS SUED, OR; STATE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS. IS ORDER SUBMITTED AS TO BARSTOW 3465, INC. ONLY OR IS DEFENDANT; GILBERTO ARAMBURO INCLUDED AS WELL? IF SO, FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.OO MUST; ALSO BE SUBMITTED TO GILBERTO ARAMBURO. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BARSTOW 3465, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $99.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BARSTOW 3465, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $99.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161003-0546 $435.00; 161003-0546-CK Reference Number 3925

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/26/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION/REVIEW RE: SANCTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF FIRM NAME OF KINER LEGAL GROUP FOR ANA DIAZ CHANGES ITS NAME TO KINER LEGAL GROUP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/29/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION/REVIEW RE: SANCTIONS; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RUSSELL J KINER PRESENT FOR ANA DIAZ.; MORRIS POLICH & PURDY FOR GILBERTO ARAMBURO, BARSTOW 3465, INC NOT PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE STATUS OF ARBITRATION / REVIEW SANCTIONS.; COURT CONFERS WITH COUNSEL REGARDING STATUS OF ARBITRATION. COUNSEL HAS HAD NO RECENT CONTACT; WITH HIS CLIENT OR OPPOSING COUNSEL. COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT SELECTION OF AN ARBITRATOR IS; PENDING. COURT DECLINES TO IMPOSE SANCTIONS.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: ARBITRATION; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 09/26/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE TO BE GIVEN BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING METTIAS & KINER LEGAL GROUP, APLC WITH KINER LEGAL GROUP AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ANA DIAZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF ARBITRATION DATE/STATUS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; RYAN MCKIM APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR GILBERTO ARAMBURO, BARSTOW 3465, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; REASON: TO SCHEDULE THE ARBITRATION; COUNSEL FOR THE DEFENSE REPORTS THAT SANCTIONS AWARDED BY JUDGE NOMOTO ON 2/27/18, AS AGAINST; PLAINTIFF, ARE OUTSTANDING. THE COURT CONTINUES THE OSC RE: ARBITRATION AND SETS THE MATTER; HEARING RE: REVIEW OF PAYMENT OF SANCTIONS. THE COURT IS INCLINED TO ADD ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS AT; COUNSELS HOURLY RATE FOR TODAYS APPEARANCE, PLUS COURT CALL EXPENSES IF SANCTIONS ARE NOT; PAID PRIOR TO THE NEXT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF ARBITRATION/REVIEW RE: SANCTIONS SET FOR 05/29/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • HEARING RE: VACATION OF STAY/OSC RE DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; B. TAM NOMOTO SCHUMANN, JUDGE; CLERK: OLIVIA MCDONALD; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY RUSS KINER PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; JAMES DEMERJIAN APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BARSTOW 3465, INC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY KINER STATES FOR THE RECORD A CHRONOLOGY OF EVENTS WITH REGARD TO THE SUSPENSION AND; ONGOING DISBARMENT PROCEEDINGS AGAINST ATTORNEY METTIAS. COUNSEL FURTHER REPORTS THAT HE WAS; FORMALLY RETAINED BY MS. DIAZ ON 12/20/17 AND IS READY TO MOVE FORWARD WITH ARBITRATION; PROCEEDINGS.; DEFENSE COUNSELS DECLARATION IN SUPPORT OF AWARD OF ATTORNEY FEES IS REVIEWED IN OPEN COURT.; THE COURT IS INCLINED TO ALLOW MATTER TO PROCEED TO ARBITRATION AND SETS THE MATTER FOR OSC RE:; ARBITRATION DATE FOR COUNSEL TO APPRISE THE COURT THE ASSIGNED ARBITRATION DATE AND WHETHER; THEY ARE READY FOR ARBITRATION.; THE COURT IMPOSES SANCTIONS ON ANA DIAZ IN THE AMOUNT OF $ $736.00 PAYABLE TO DEFENSE COUNSEL ON OR BEFORE 02/27/18.; THE COURT DECLINES TO IMPOSE ADDITIONAL SANCTIONS AT THIS TIME.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE : STATUS OF ARBITRATION DATE/STATUS SET FOR 03/27/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY GILBERTO ARAMBURO FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171221-0420 $435.00; 171221-0420-CK Reference Number 122829

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • DEFENDANT GILBERTO ARAMBURO FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2016 OF ANA DIAZ FOR GILBERTO ARAMBURO, BARSTOW 3465, INC, ATTORNEY MORRIS POLICH & PURDY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JAMES H DEMERJIAN IN SPPRT OF REQ FOR SANCT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 12/20/2016
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2016 OF ANA DIAZ, BARSTOW 3465, INC IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF REJECTION SENT.; Minutes; STIPULATION/ORDER FOR BINDING ARBITRATION AND STAY OF ACTION AND CHECK #111124 ($435.00) ARE; RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): BARSTOW 3465, INC. MUST BE NAMED AS SUED, OR; STATE ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS. IS ORDER SUBMITTED AS TO BARSTOW 3465, INC. ONLY OR IS DEFENDANT; GILBERTO ARAMBURO INCLUDED AS WELL? IF SO, FIRST APPEARANCE FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.OO MUST; ALSO BE SUBMITTED TO GILBERTO ARAMBURO. PLEASE CORRECT AND RESUBMIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2016
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/03/2016 OF ANA DIAZ FOR BARSTOW 3465, INC, ATTORNEY MORRIS POLICH & PURDY ADDED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BARSTOW 3465, INC; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/26/16 WITH COSTS OF $99.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 161003-0546 $435.00; 161003-0546-CK Reference Number 3925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.