This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:33:53 (UTC).

AMGUARD INSURANCE-V-COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 AMGUARD INSURANCE-V-COMFORT HAYS ELECTRIC was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7908

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC.,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOODE, HEMME & PETERSON

6256 Greenwich Dr, Ste 500

San Diego, CA 92122

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC., FILED; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC., FILED; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC.,; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,259.62 INTEREST $1,148.10 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $315.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,722.72; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DECLARATION OF JERRY D HEMME FILED

DECLARATION OF JERRY D HEMME FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

DECLARATION OF WAYNE VIDZICKI FILED

DECLARATION OF WAYNE VIDZICKI FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC., FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC., FILED.

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC.,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC.,; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 11/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/17/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/17/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 01/08/18; JUDGMENT FOR: AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC.,; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,259.62 INTEREST $1,148.10 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $315.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,722.72; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF JERRY D HEMME FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF WAYNE VIDZICKI FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC., FILED; DEFAULT NOT ENTERED. REASON: PREVIOUSLY DEFAULTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC., FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO COMFORT & HAYS ELECTRIC, INC.,.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $3,259.62

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMGUARD INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170915-0149 $240.00; 170915-0149-EZ Reference Number 2339640

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • VACATE OSCD1 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/17/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less