This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 10/18/2019 at 22:38:23 (UTC).

AMF 1278, LLC -V- CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 AMF 1278, LLC filed an Other - Writ Of Mandamus lawsuit against CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2219

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Writ Of Mandamus

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioners

AMF 1278, LLC

WENDY J. MCCAMMACK

Respondents and Interested Parties

MARK SCOTT

CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

Interested Parties

VINCENT GUZMAN

CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO

IRINA SEPARATE PROP TR BROCE

DAVIS FAMILY TRUST

SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY BOARD OFED

WILLIAM F VALOV

MOHAMMAD WAHEED & YVETTE WAUGH

RAFAEL AYALA GUARDADO & JANET MORALES

JAMES A DODSON & LOUISE V DODSON

SOUTHEASTERN CALIFASSN 7TH DAY ADV

WILLIE LIVING TRUST BRUE

RBI LANDSCAPE INC

MASONIC BUILDING AND HOLDING ASSN

ALEJANDRO OBREGON & MARIA OBREGON

MARIO GUERRA GALICIA

EASTLAND CONSTRUCTION INC

HANI ATTALLA

132 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MILLIGAN, BESWICK LEVINE & KNOX

1447 Ford Street Suite 201

Redlands, CA 92374

Respondent Attorneys

COTA COLE & HUBER LLP

3401 Centrelake Dr Suite 670

Ontario, CA 91761

SANEZ, GARY D

290 N D Street 3Rd Floor

San Bernardino, CA 92401

COLE HUBER LLP

3401 Centrelake Drive Suite 670

Ontario, CA 91761

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY SHON K PAHIO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY SHON K PAHIO WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO SOUTHEASTERN CALIFASSN 7TH DAYADV. PARTY SERVED ON 06/29/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO SOUTHEASTERN CALIFASSN 7TH DAYADV. PARTY SERVED ON 06/29/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

DECLARATION OF ROGER JON DIAMOND IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR STAY FILED.

DECLARATION OF ROGER JON DIAMOND IN OPPOSITION TO APPLICATION FOR STAY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS/AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT FILED AS TO HOWARD INLAND EMPIRE PROPERTIESLLC &. PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF 1ST AMENDED SUMMONS/AMENDED PETITION FOR WRIT FILED AS TO HOWARD INLAND EMPIRE PROPERTIESLLC &. PARTY SERVED ON 07/14/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, MARK SCOTT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GARY D SANEZ.

ANSWER FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, MARK SCOTT; PARTY REPRESENTED BY GARY D SANEZ.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY HAYS SANDERS WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY HAYS SANDERS WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

PETITION FILED (CIVIL)

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MICHAEL P S NIJJAR WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MICHAEL P S NIJJAR WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MANUEL CALLEROS & LILLY CALLEROS WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT BY MANUEL CALLEROS & LILLY CALLEROS WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 07/05/17 FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY OF PROCEEDINGS TO BE HEARD ON 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: STAY OF PROCEEDINGS TO BE HEARD ON 08/21/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S26X.

DECLARATION OF KARMEL ROE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FILED

DECLARATION OF KARMEL ROE IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE FILED

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

QUIANG YES MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY FILED.

QUIANG YES MEMO OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR STAY FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO HAYS SANDERS. PARTY SERVED ON 06/27/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT FILED AS TO HAYS SANDERS. PARTY SERVED ON 06/27/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS BY MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

87 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DCA ORDER PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE & STAY ARE DENIED PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2017
  • HEARING RE: EVIDENTIARY HEARING; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE 2ND LODGING OF DOCUMENT FILED IN RELATED CASE FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF LODGING DOCUMENTS FILED IN RELATED CASES FILED BY CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, MARK SCOTT, VINCENT GUZMAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • INDEX OF EXHIBITS FILED BY BUBBA LIKES TORTILLAS - FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BEN EILENBERG FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • TRIAL BRIEF FILED BY BUBBA LIKES TORTILLAS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITIONERS POSITION PAPER RE: FORMAT OF HEARING ON THE MERITS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
216 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, HAYS SANDERS, VIDAL VASQUEZ & PEDRO VASQUEZ, VIDAL & CLAUDIA VASQUEZ, LILLIE LOUISE BEASLEY IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, CHRISTOPHER D DEAN& JOYCE E DEAN, JAMES A DODSON & LOUISE DODSON, JAMES A DODSON & LOUISE V DODSON, 2743 LLC IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, HERBERT L SIMS & SALLY M SIMS, REDEVELOPMENT AGENCY OF CITY OFSAN BNDO, INLAND COUNTY CONSTRUCTION INC, EASTLAND CONSTRUCTION INC IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN ITEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, RAYMOND HSIEH, SHELDON E NEVENS, ARTHUR L. DAVIS & FREDDAI DAVIS, STARLITE MGMT LII LP IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PARTY IRINA SEPARATE PROPTR BROCE UPDATED: UPDATED REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST NAME

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, DELMUS J . LARKIN, IRINA SEPARATE PROPTR BROCE, WILLIAM F VALOV IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, DAVID MICHAEL & COINC, SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY BOARD OFED, AGAVA PROPERTIES LLC, CITY OF SAN BERNARDINO, ACAA LP IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, UNITED PROPERTY HOLDINGSLLC, DOANE PET CARE COMPANY, CABOT IV CA1WO8 LLC, CAMPANA FAMILY LIVING TRUST IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, YOCOM BALDWIN DEVELOPMENT & TRANSITION PROP, TRANSITION PROPERTIES, BUBBA LIKES TORTILLAS LLC, SAN BERNARDINO UNIFIED SCHOOL DIS IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • ON THE MISC. PETITION - CIVIL (UNLIMITED) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMF 1278, LLC, UNITED STATES POSTAL SERVICE, SB HALLMARK MANAGEMENT LLC, IPT 1-215 DC II LP IS ADDED AS A REAL PARTIES IN INTEREST.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.