This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:31:13 (UTC).

AMEX-V-PETROVSKY

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 AMEX-V-PETROVSKY was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9497

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

ADAM PETROVSKY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

555 St Charles Drive Suite 204

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Defendant Attorney

LUFTMAN, HECK & ASSOCIATES, LLP

1958 Sunset Cliffs Blvd

San Diego, CA 92107

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAM PETROVSKY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $107.50 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAM PETROVSKY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $107.50 FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY ADAM PETROVSKY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LUFTMAN, HECK & ASSOCIATES, LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY ADAM PETROVSKY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LUFTMAN, HECK & ASSOCIATES, LLP.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 10/16/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 10/16/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/04/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ADAM PETROVSKY; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/12/17 WITH COSTS OF $107.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF ANSWER BY MAIL ON 10/16/17 AS TO PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • DEFENDANT ADAM PETROVSKY FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADAM PETROVSKY FOR FAX FILING/CC/P&E Minutes; Receipt: 171016-0909 $5.71

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY ADAM PETROVSKY; PARTY REPRESENTED BY LUFTMAN, HECK & ASSOCIATES, LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • CREDIT CARD TRANSACTION ID NUMBER 033-0037605490

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ADAM PETROVSKY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171016-0907 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FOR ADAM PETROVSKY, ADD ADAM GLEN PETROVSKY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FOR ADAM PETROVSKY, ADD EVOLUTIONARY SELLING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FOR 1ST APPEARANCE; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0819 $435.00; 171004-0819-CK Reference Number CK 23982

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S26

    Read MoreRead Less