This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 15:34:47 (UTC).

AMERICAN-V-GAUTHIER

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 AMERICAN-V-GAUTHIER was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1858

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendants

JEANNE GAUTHIER

GAUTHIER & ASSOCIATES, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

555 St Charles Drive Suite 204

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/09/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2017
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/10/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON JEANNE GAUTHIER; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/18/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON GAUTHIER & ASSOCIATES, INC.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 03/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $65.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST ENDING DATE OF 07/27/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170209-0191 $240.00; 170209-0191-CK Reference Number 6739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $4,349.59

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 07/27/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.