This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 10:19:44 (UTC).

ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP-V-SWAGWAY,ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/10/2018 ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP-V-SWAGWAY was filed as a Personal Injury - Other Product Liability lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3524

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Product Liability

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AMERICAN STRATEGICINSURANCE COMPANY

ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SWAGWAY, LLC

BEST BUY, INC.

HOVERZON, LLC

PRO COM PRODUCTS, INC.

BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COZEN O'CONNER

501 W Broadway, Suite 1610

San Diego, CA 92101

Cross Defendant and Defendant Attorneys

VINCENT CHAN

120 South Del Mar Avenue #2875

San Gabriel, CA 91778

SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS

1801 Century Park East Ninth Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90067

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

310 Golden Shore Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

PRINDLE GOETZ BARNES & REINHOLTZ LLP

310 Golden Shore Fourth Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RULING ON AT FURTHER TRIAL SETTING FILED.

NOTICE OF RULING ON AT FURTHER TRIAL SETTING FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP.

NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP.

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY HOVERZON, LLC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/01/19 FILED

NOTICE OF ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT OF S&C BY HOVERZON, LLC WITH RECEIPT DATE OF 03/01/19 FILED

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SWAGWAY, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SWAGWAY, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2018 OF BEST BUY STORES, L.P. NAMING ROES 1 TO BE HOVERZON, LLC FILED

AMENDMENT TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2018 OF BEST BUY STORES, L.P. NAMING ROES 1 TO BE HOVERZON, LLC FILED

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SWAGWAY, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO SWAGWAY, LLC, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH CIVDS1833306 FILED BY BEST BUY STORES, L.P..

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE WITH CIVDS1833306 FILED BY BEST BUY STORES, L.P..

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CASES (CIVDS1833306) FILED BY PRO COM PRODUCTS, INC..

NOTICE OF RELATED CASE CASES (CIVDS1833306) FILED BY PRO COM PRODUCTS, INC..

ANSWER FILED BY PRO COM PRODUCTS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS.

ANSWER FILED BY PRO COM PRODUCTS, INC.; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SCHONBUCH & LEBOVITS.; Minutes; Receipt: 190207-0527 $435.00; 190207-0527-CK Reference Number 65098

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE NAME OF PLTF FILED.

AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT TO SUBSTITUTE NAME OF PLTF FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO PERMIT AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT FILED.

STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: TO PERMIT AMENDMENT OF COMPLAINT FILED.

DECLARATION OF PETER A LYNCH IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED AMENDENT FILED

DECLARATION OF PETER A LYNCH IN SUPPORT OF STIPULATED AMENDENT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2018 OF BEST BUY STORES, L.P. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 10/25/2018 OF BEST BUY STORES, L.P. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2018 OF ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP BY BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 09/10/2018 OF ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP BY BEST BUY STORES, L.P.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

31 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT E ROBLES; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PETER A. LYNCH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP.; ATTORNEY ERIC HAGLE APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR BEST BUY STORES, L.P..; ATTORNEY YARDEN FEDIDA PRESENT FOR PRO COM PRODUCTS.; ATTORNEY VINCENT CHAN PRESENT FOR HOVERZON.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT HEARS THIS MATTER WITH RELATED MATTER CIVDS1833306.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF ALL COUNSEL.; REASON: PRIVATE MEDIATION IS SCHEDULED FOR 01/15/2020.; COURT CONTINUES THIS MATTER TO ALLOW PARTIES TO PARTICIPATE IN MEDIATION (POSSIBLY A GLOBAL; MEDIATION) AND TO ALLOW COUNSEL TO DISCUSS THEIR RESPECTIVE TRIAL CALENDARS IF TRIAL DATES WILL BE; REQUESTED AT THE NEXT HEARING.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 10/10/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RULING ON AT FURTHER TRIAL SETTING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • HEARING RE: FURTHER TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; KEITH D DAVIS, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; COURT REPORTER TRACI TROLI 13302; COURT ATTENDANT G TREIHART; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY PETER LYNCH APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP.; ATTORNEY MARY R. FERSCH PRESENT FOR PRO COM PRODUCTS, INC.; ATTORNEY VINCENT CHAN PRESENT FOR HOVERSON, LLC.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF COUNSEL.; REASON: MEDIATOR TO BE SELECTED & MEDIATION TO BE SET.; COUNSEL TO PROVIDE THE COURT A STATUS UPDATE AT NEXT HEARING REGARDING A POTENTIAL MOTIONS.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/12/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S25.; COUNSEL FOR PRO-COM PRODUCTS TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION AND ORDER RE: PROTECTIVE ORDER ON CONFIDENTIAL DESIGNATIONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP FOR STIP & ORDER FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 190517-0899 $20.00; 190517-0899-CK Reference Number CK #65471

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY HOVERZON, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY VINCENT CHAN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • ANSWER TO CROSS COMPLAINT BY HOVERZON, LLC IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): INFORMED FIRM THAT PARTY IS NOT LISTED ON CROSS COMPLAINT.

    Read MoreRead Less
59 More Docket Entries
  • 09/14/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON BEST BUY STORES, L.P.; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 09/11/18 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • PLAINTIFF ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ASI SELECT INSURANCE CORP FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180910-0654 $435.00; 180910-0654-CK Reference Number 3633160

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF DOCUMENT NEEDED SENT.; Minutes; NO CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT PROVIDED WITH NEW FILING. PLEASE SUBMIT ONE AS SOON AS POSSIBLE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.