This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 01:59:01 (UTC).

AMERICAN GENERAL -V- ROSALES

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 AMERICAN GENERAL filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ROSALES. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0325

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN GENERAL FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC.,

Defendant

ERICK J ROSALES

Assignee

LVNV FUNDING, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Assignee Attorney

ROBERT J COLCLOUGH

9301 Oakdale Ave Suite 205

Chatsworth, CA 91311

 

Court Documents

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $770.96)

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $770.96)

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Under Submission

HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ROBERT JCOLCLOUGH FOR LVNV FUNDING, LLC NOT PRESENT; DEFENDANT ERICK J ROSALES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED.; WITNESS -- ERICK J. ROSALES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GRANTED IN PART; LEVYING OFFICER LOCATION: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; COURT ORDERS ALL MONIES EXEMPT EXCEPT $100.00 PER MONTH, COMMENCING 11/30/17.; THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER PRINTED FOR ERICK J ROSALES; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:10; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

WRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY COSTS OF $12.00 FILED.

WRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY COSTS OF $12.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/06/16.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/06/16.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC, FOR $3,209.16.

MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC, FOR $3,209.16.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT (SCISS 142874) (IMAGED)

ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT (SCISS 142874) (IMAGED)

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.

RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 02/23/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT LVNV FUNDING, LLC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ERICK J ROSALES:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,507.38 INTEREST $3,209.16 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,746.54; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/06/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 7542.50 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • WRIT FEE OF $25.00 PAID; Minutes; Receipt: 180806-0489 $25.00; 180806-0489-CK Reference Number 502347

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $770.96)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION AND MINUTE ORDER SENT TO SAN BERNARDINO SHERI.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DETERMINING CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION; Disposition: Under Submission; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; ROBERT JCOLCLOUGH FOR LVNV FUNDING, LLC NOT PRESENT; DEFENDANT ERICK J ROSALES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:05; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION SUBMITTED.; WITNESS -- ERICK J. ROSALES IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; CLAIM OF EXEMPTION GRANTED IN PART; LEVYING OFFICER LOCATION: SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY; COURT ORDERS ALL MONIES EXEMPT EXCEPT $100.00 PER MONTH, COMMENCING 11/30/17.; THE LEVYING OFFICER IS DIRECTED TO RELEASE ANY MONIES HELD TO THE JUDGMENT CREDITOR FOR PAYMENT ON THE JUDGMENT.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ORDER TO LEVYING OFFICER PRINTED FOR ERICK J ROSALES; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:10; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CLAIM OF EXEMPTION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC FOR CLAIM OF EX HRG; Minutes; Receipt: 171023-0275 $60.00; 171023-0275-CK Reference Number CK#11786

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED ORANGE COUNTY COSTS OF $12.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( $6771.54 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC FOR SB WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 170427-0275 $25.00; 170427-0275-CK Reference Number CK#403050

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT SERVED ON 12/06/16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT RETURNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMO OF COSTS FILED BY LVNV FUNDING, LLC, FOR $3,209.16.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT ISSUED. COPY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORIGINAL CASE WITH JUDGMENT (SCISS 142874) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • APPLICATION AND ORDER FOR RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 161201-0457 $30.00; 161201-0457-CK Reference Number 11061

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • RENEWAL OF JUDGMENT FILED.; Minutes; ORIGINAL JUDGMENT ENTERED 02/23/07 IS ORDERED RENEWED AS FOLLOWS:; IT IS ORDERED AND ADJUDGED THAT LVNV FUNDING, LLC HAVE &; RECOVER FROM ERICK J ROSALES:; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,507.38 INTEREST $3,209.16 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $30.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $6,746.54; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT OTHER CLERK JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.