This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:25:09 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS-V-ZORAN ZRNIC

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS-V-ZORAN ZRNIC was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7859

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK

Defendant

ZORAN ZRNIC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MICHAEL & ASSOCIATES

555 St Charles Dr Suite 100

Thousand Oaks, CA 91360

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ZORAN ZRNIC WITH COSTS OF $107.50

PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ZORAN ZRNIC WITH COSTS OF $107.50

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

AMENDED DEC OF NON SERVICE ON ZORAN ZRNIC COSTS OF $107.50 FILED.

AMENDED DEC OF NON SERVICE ON ZORAN ZRNIC COSTS OF $107.50 FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY JOHN FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:47; ON PLAINTIFFS OWN MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: PER MOVING PARTY.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - OTHER BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:40; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2018
  • DECLARATION OF LINA M MICHAEL RE OSC RE SERVICE COMPLETION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED DEC OF NON SERVICE ON ZORAN ZRNIC COSTS OF $107.50 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE UNSERVED AS TO ZORAN ZRNIC WITH COSTS OF $107.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN EXPRESS CENTURION BANK FOR NEW FILIGN FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0836 $380.00; 170914-0836-CK Reference Number 22925

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less