This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 16:36:03 (UTC).

AMERICAN EXPRESS -V- MUNOZ

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 AMERICAN EXPRESS filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MUNOZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2153

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB

Defendant

ROSEANN MUNOZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZWICKER & ASSOCIATES

700 N. Brand Boulevard Suite 500

Glendale, CA 91203

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF CH. 13 BANKRUPTCY CASE, 6:17-BK-18230-MH FILED BY ROSEANN MUNOZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2017
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( $1,990.55 ); Minutes; Receipt: 170612-0207 $25.00; 170612-0207-CK Reference Number 660183

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB ORDERED ENTERED 04/10/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ROSEANN MUNOZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,661.05 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $304.50 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,965.55; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • NOTICE OF INTENTION TO INCUR COURT COSTS AND LEGAL FEES BY FILING SUIT CCP 1033 (B)(2) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON ROSEANN MUNOZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO ROSEANN MUNOZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2017
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 02/06/2017 OF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,661.05

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 02/06/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY AMERICAN EXPRESS BANK, FSB FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170207-0313 $240.00; 170207-0313-CK Reference Number CK 638606

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.