This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/10/2018 at 11:18:28 (UTC).

AMAYA -V- VELAZQUEZ

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 AMAYA filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against VELAZQUEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2091

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

FILEMON AMAYA

Defendant

ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B

634 Oak Ct

San Bernardino, CA 92410

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2011
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FILEMON AMAYA GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: FILEMON AMAYA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $750.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $465.00 AND DAMAGES $925.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,140.00; ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2011
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2011
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY WRIT RETURNED SATISFIED WITH ADDED COSTS OF $ $125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2011
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ATTY BIN)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION -- WRIT FEE TAKEN.; Minutes; Receipt: 110520-1999 $25.00; 110520-1999-CK Reference Number 176574

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 05/05/11 WITH FEES OF $60.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 05/05/11 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FILEMON AMAYA AS TO ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FILEMON AMAYA ORDERED ENTERED 05/17/11; JUDGMENT FOR: FILEMON AMAYA; JUDGMENT AGAINST: ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: ERNESTO POLANCO VELAZQUEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2011
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 05/04/2011 OF FILEMON AMAYA, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-4184 $255.00; 110504-4184-CK Reference Number 175738

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $750.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $25.00.

    Read MoreRead Less