This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 11:48:28 (UTC).

ALZAGA -V- NISSAN NORTH AMERICA

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ALZAGA filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NISSAN NORTH AMERICA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1614

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JASMINE TORO

ROBERTO ALZAGA

Defendant

NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROMANO STANCROFF PC

360 N. Sepulveda Blvd Suite 1010

El Segundo, CA 90245

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0319 $435.00; 160201-0319-CK Reference Number 7742

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/12/2016
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • RETURN TO COURT'S CONTROL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2016
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2016
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY ROBERTO ALZAGA, JASMINE TORO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2016
  • MATTER STAYED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON NISSAN NORTH AMERICA, INC., A CALIFORNIA; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 02/05/16 WITH COSTS OF $40.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S23

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0319 $435.00; 160201-0319-CK Reference Number 7742

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less