This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/11/2018 at 22:42:51 (UTC).

ALLY FINANCIAL INC -V- DEXTER FORBES ETAL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 ALLY FINANCIAL INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DEXTER FORBES ETAL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********5771

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLY FINANCIAL INC.

Defendants

DEXTER FORBES

LAURA Y CARTER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION

110 E. Wilshire Ave Ste 212

Fullerton, CA 92832

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/26/2018
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF EXECUTION FROM RIVERSIDE COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY ( 5728.33 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLY FINANCIAL INC. FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 161017-0739 $25.00; 161017-0739-CK Reference Number 0703075

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $582.53) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO RIVERSIDE COUNTY ( $5728.33 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLY FINANCIAL INC. FOR RIVERSIDE WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 160812-0751 $25.00; 160812-0751-CK Reference Number CK#0695685

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $582.53) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( $6,310.86 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLY FINANCIAL INC. FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 150421-0261 $25.00; 150421-0261-CK Reference Number 631673

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2015
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING VANLOCHEM & ASSOCIATES WITH WINN LAW GROUP, A PROFESSIONALCORPORATION AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR ALLY FINANCIAL INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
24 More Docket Entries
  • 05/11/2011
  • POINTS & AUTHORITIES FILED BY ALLY FINANCIAL INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSIONS AFTER HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLY FINANCIAL INC. FOR APP FOR WRIT OF POSESSION; Minutes; Receipt: 110511-0265 $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APP FOR WOP AND HRG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON APP FOR WOP AND HRG FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2011
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION AFTER HEARING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 05/04/2011 OF ALLY FINANCIAL INC. - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-0275 $240.00; 110504-0275-CK Reference Number 1863

    Read MoreRead Less