This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 17:24:29 (UTC).

ALLIANCE -V- GRANDPARK, ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/06/2017 ALLIANCE filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GRANDPARK. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2385

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE ENTERTAINMENT

Defendants

WILLIAM HSU

GRANDPARK CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRODKIN, ALAN L

15500 B Rockfield Blvd

Irvine, CA 92618

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2018
  • HEARING RE: MTN QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS/ALTERNATIVE ORAP; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: REGINA ESTRADA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:49; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCE MADE BY PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; 09:50; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2018
  • BENCH WARRANT RECALL PLACED IN FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUANCE OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR EXAMINATION FILED BY ALLIANCE ENTERTAINMENT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2018
  • HEARING RE: MTN QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS/ALTERNATIVE ORAP; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: JENNIFER MEDINA; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT M DE LA ROSA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ROBERT MORRIS FOR ALAN L. BRODKIN FOR PLAINTIFF.; DEFENDANT WILLIAM HSU PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:08; PARTIES ARE TO PROCEED WITH EXAMINATION HEARING.; WITNESS -- WILLIAM HSU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; 09:11; COURT IN RECESS.; 09:31; PARTIES AGREE TO A FURTHER HEARING TO ALLOW DEFENDANT TO PROVIDE ANY OTHER DOCUMENTS; REQUESTED.; WILLIAM HSU IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 02/14/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 09:31; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2018
  • DECLARATION OF ALAN L BRODKIN RE: SERVICE OF ORAP FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2017
  • ARRAIGNMENT ON BENCH WARRANT; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: ARLENE GUARDADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT CHRISTIAN HERNANDEZ; APPEARANCES:; DEFENDANT WILLIAM HSU PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 01:21; ACTION CAME ON FOR ARRAIGNMENT ON BENCH WARRANT.; WITNESS -- WILLIAM HSU IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ARRAIGNMENT HELD; COURT MAKES INQUIRIES.; DEBTOR CONTENDS HE WAS NOT PROPERLY SERVED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; BENCH WARRANT RECALLED; WILLIAM HSU IS/ARE ORDERED TO RETURN ON CONTINUED DATE WITHOUT FURTHER NOTICE OR SUBPOENA.; COURT SETS A MOTION TO QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE, SETS THE MATTER FOR A; JUDGMENT DEBTORS EXAMINATION AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: MTN QUASH SERVICE OF SUMMONS/ALTERNATIVE ORAP SET FOR 01/24/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 12/29/17 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 01:26; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • BENCH WARRANT ISSUED FOR WILLIAM HSU, BAIL $10,000, MAY FORFEIT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2017
  • ORIG BENCH WARRANT MAILED TO LA SHERIFF, POMONA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2017
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: B/W ISSUED; Minutes; MICHAEL M DEST, JUDGE; CLERK: BRENDA TIRADO; COURT REPORTER NO REPORTER NONE; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY ATTORNEY ROBERT MORRIS FOR JUDGMENT CREDITOR.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: WILLIAM HSU; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:32; COURT PLACES MATTER ON 2ND CALL TO ALLOW FOR JUDGMENT DEBTOR WILLIAM HSU TO BE PRESENT.; 08:50; COURT RECONVENES WITH COUNSEL PRESENT; JUDGMENT DEBTOR FAILS TO APPEAR FOR DEBTOR'S EXAM;BENCH WARRANT IS ORDERED ISSUED FOR WILLIAM HSU IN THE AMOUNT OF $10,000.00 -- BAIL MAY BE FORFEITED.; BENCH WARRANT TO BE ISSUED UPON RECEIPT OF SIGNED AFFIDAVIT AND PROCESSING FEE MADE PAYABLE TO THE APPROPRIATE SERVING AGENCY.; ACTION - COMPLETE; 08:50; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 02/27/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/07/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2017
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO GRANDPARK CORPORATION, A CALIFORNIA SERVED ON 02/17/17 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLIANCE ENTERTAINMENT FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170208-0831 $240.00; 170208-0831-CK Reference Number CK#101233

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ALLIANCE ENTERTAINMENT FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.