This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/07/2018 at 10:50:07 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED -V- VICTOR MANUEL

Case Summary

On 05/04/2011 ALLIANCE UNITED filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against VICTOR MANUEL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********4531

  • Filing Date:

    05/04/2011

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

VICTOR MANUEL

OSWALDO GALVAN

JEANETTE LESLIE JAUREGUI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TODD F HAINES

30495 Canwood St Suite 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/15/2013
  • CERTIFICATE OF FACTS ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 130215-4896 $31.00; 130215-4896-CK Reference Number 24453

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2012
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 120511-1973 $25.00; 120511-1973-CK Reference Number 20589

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2012
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2012
  • VACATE OSCD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 05/09/12 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 04/16/12; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JEANETTE LESLIE JAUREGUI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $6,232.19 INTEREST $690.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $283.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $7,205.19; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO OSWALDO GALVAN, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DECLARATION OF JEFF STEPEK FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • DECLARATION OF TODD F HAINES PURSUANT TO CCP 1033 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2012
  • MEMORANDUM OF INTEREST FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 07/05/2011
  • AMENDMENT TO COMPLAINT NAMING DOES DOE 2 TO BE JEANETTE LESLIE JAUREGUI FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • ON THE COMPLAINT FILED 05/04/2011 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, JEANETTE LESLIE JAUREGUI IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2011
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO VICTOR MANUEL, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO VICTOR MANUEL SERVED ON 05/14/11 WITH FEES OF $43.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2011
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/26/11 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT R9.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE AND PARTY INFORMATION ADDED; Minutes; Receipt: 110504-3816 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT R9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2011
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less