Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 23:38:13 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED -V- JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO

Case Summary

On 07/21/2015 ALLIANCE UNITED filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0285

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants and Cross Defendants

JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO

GABRIEL ROJAS

GURMEY SINGH PAMDHER

BAL CARRIER, INC

GURMEET SINGH PANDHER

JOSE ANTONMIO PINEDA-CASTILLO

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

GURMEET SINGH PANDHER

BAL CARRIER,INC., A CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AINES, LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. H

30495 Canwood Street Suite 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

TRACHTMAN & TRACHTMAN

23046 Avenida De La Carlota Suite 300

Laguna Hills, CA 92653

 

Court Documents

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FILED

JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 02/03/16; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,536.14 INTEREST $691.30 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $288.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,515.44; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO GABRIEL ROJAS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO GABRIEL ROJAS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/08/2015 OF GURMEET PANDHER FILED BY GURMEET SINGH PANDHER, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/08/2015 OF GURMEET PANDHER FILED BY GURMEET SINGH PANDHER, WITHOUT PREJUDICE.; Minutes; DISMISS COMPLAINT OF GURMEET SINGH PANDHER, ON 01/12/16

DECLARATION OF JEFF STEPEK IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY ISO APP FOR FILED

DECLARATION OF JEFF STEPEK IN LIEU OF LIVE TESTIMONY ISO APP FOR FILED

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO.

ORDER GRANTING APPL FOR ORDR DETERMINING GFS BY BAL CARRIER INC AND GURMEET SINGH PANDHER FILED

ORDER GRANTING APPL FOR ORDR DETERMINING GFS BY BAL CARRIER INC AND GURMEET SINGH PANDHER FILED

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY BAL CARRIER INC AND GURMEE T SINGH PANDHER FILED.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT BY BAL CARRIER INC AND GURMEE T SINGH PANDHER FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BAL CARRIER, INC, GURMEET SINGH PANDHER.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY BAL CARRIER, INC, GURMEET SINGH PANDHER.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT NAMING DOES ROE 1 TO BE GABRIEL ROJAS FILED.

AMENDMENT TO CROSS COMPLAINT NAMING DOES ROE 1 TO BE GABRIEL ROJAS FILED.

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GURMEET SINGH PANDHER

DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL FILED BY GURMEET SINGH PANDHER

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/08/2015 OF GURMEET PANDHER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

SUMMONS ISSUED ON CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED 09/08/2015 OF GURMEET PANDHER - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BAL CARRIER, INC SERVED ON 07/28/15 WITH FEES OF $57.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BAL CARRIER, INC SERVED ON 07/28/15 WITH FEES OF $57.00.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/14/2016
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2016
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 02/03/16; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $9,536.14 INTEREST $691.30 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $288.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,515.44; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF BRIAN P TAPPER IN RESP TO REJECTION OF DEF JGMT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO GABRIEL ROJAS, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT ALREADY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR CLERKS/COURT JUDGEMENT FILED ON JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-CASTILLO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; BARRY L PLOTKIN, JUDGE; CLERK: STEPHANIE CHANDLER; COURT ATTENDANT C MIRAGLIA; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:00; APPEARANCES:; SPECIAL APPEARANCE BY JOHN R FARMER FOR PLAINTIFF.; PROCEEDINGS:; HEARING ON: OSC RE SERVICE COMPLETION HELD; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL INFORMS THE COURT THAT CASE HAS BEEN SETTLED AS TO DEFENDANT(S) BAL CARRIER,; INC., AND GURMEET SINGH PANDHER AND THOSE DEFENDANTS HAVE BEEN DISMISSED.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: REQUEST MORE TIME TO SERVE AND/OR DISMISS; DEFENDANT GABRIEL ROJAS AND RESUBMIT DEFAULT; JUDGMENT AS TO DEFENDANT JOSE ANTONIO PINEDA-; CASTILLO.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL IS ADVISED OF THE ONE JUDGMENT RULE IN REGARDS TO RESUBMISSION OF THE; DEFAULT JUDGMENT.; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/14/16 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35.; 09:03; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2016
  • CASE TRANSFERRED TO NEW DEPARTMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
29 More Docket Entries
  • 09/08/2015
  • ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, GURMEY SINGH PAMDHER REMOVED AS A PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/08/2015
  • ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/21/2015 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY, GURMEET SINGH PANDHER IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO BAL CARRIER, INC SERVED ON 07/28/15 WITH FEES OF $57.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 150721-2174 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2015
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY CORP is a litigant