This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 08:32:16 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED -V- HUFF

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 ALLIANCE UNITED -V- HUFF was filed as a Contract - Insurance lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3104

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Insurance

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendant

LAURIE HUFF

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AINES, LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. H

30495 Canwood Street Suite 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/26/2018
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITH PREJUDICE.; Minutes; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL NO ADR BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2018
  • ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED; Minutes; SET ASIDE DISPOSITION OF DEFENDANT LAURIE HUFF.; SET ASIDE REQUEST FOR DEFAULT AS TO LAURIE HUFF; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY.; SET ASIDE DISMISSED DOES ON THE COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 07/11/2017 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • STIPULATION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FOR STIP FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0276 $20.00; 180517-0276-CK Reference Number 325205

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DEFENDANT LAURIE HUFF FIRST PAPER FEE PAID IN FULL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY LAURIE HUFF FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 180517-0272 $240.00; 180517-0272-CK Reference Number 8920

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2018
  • STIP/ORDER TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): FIRST APPEARANCE FEES ARE NEEDED FOR DEFENDANT. RESUBMIT WITH FEES F.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS [FTC 3.110(H)] / STATUS DEFAULT JMNT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180306-0737 $25.00; 180306-0737-CK Reference Number 52047

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 07/11/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $9,340.28

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 10.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 03/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 170711-0649 $240.00; 170711-0649-CK Reference Number CK49296

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less