This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 03:00:58 (UTC).

ALLIANCE UNITED-V-CARLOS RICO ET AL

Case Summary

On 09/14/2017 ALLIANCE UNITED-V-CARLOS RICO was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7753

  • Filing Date:

    09/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

Defendants

CARLOS RICO SANCHEZ

FABIO NAHUEL DIEZ

KARLA OROZCO SANCHEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

AINES, LAW OFFICES OF TODD F. H

30495 Canwood Street Suite 100

Agoura Hills, CA 91301

 

Court Documents

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FABIO NAHUEL DIEZ SERVED ON 12/10/17 WITH FEES OF $93.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET AS TO FABIO NAHUEL DIEZ SERVED ON 12/10/17 WITH FEES OF $93.00.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • ABSTRACT OF JUDGMENT ISSUED; Minutes; Receipt: 180806-0841 $25.00; 180806-0841-CK Reference Number 5881

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY ORDERED ENTERED 06/29/18; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: FABIO NAHUEL DIEZ, KARLA OROZCO SANCHEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $3,431.90 INTEREST $484.42 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $394.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,310.32; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: TODD F. HAINES FILED BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED AS TO CARLOS RICO SANCHEZ, WITHOUT PREJUDICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KARLA OROZCO SANCHEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/14/2017 OF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY AS TO KARLA OROZCO SANCHEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 12/15/2017
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/15/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FOR NEW FILING; Minutes; Receipt: 170914-0349 $240.00; 170914-0349-CK Reference Number 49837

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PLAINTIFF ALLIANCE UNITED INSURANCE COMPANY FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2017
  • PARTY FABIO NAHUEL DIEZ UPDATED: CORRECTED NAME

    Read MoreRead Less