This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 10:53:52 (UTC).

ALLEN-V-EDWARDS ET AL

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ALLEN-V-EDWARDS was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0793

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN PROPERTIES

Defendants

TAMMY EDWARDS

TAYLOR EDWARDS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST JOHN LLP

2040 Main Street, Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SCS)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( FORWARDED TO SCS)

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1798 $255.00; 160201-1798-CK Reference Number 515751

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ALLEN PROPERTIES GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLEN PROPERTIES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,205.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $595.00 AND DAMAGES $2,128.48.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,428.48; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/10/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/10/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS; POSTED ON 02/10/16 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS; POSTED ON 02/10/16 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ALLEN PROPERTIES ORDERED ENTERED 03/01/16; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLEN PROPERTIES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ALLEN PROPERTIES GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: ALLEN PROPERTIES; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,205.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $595.00 AND DAMAGES $2,128.48.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,428.48; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2016
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2016
  • MONEY JUDGMENT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ORIGINAL SIGNATURE IS NEEDED IN DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2016
  • 585 RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2016
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 03/01/2016
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ALLEN PROPERTIES AS TO TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/01/2016 OF ALLEN PROPERTIES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET BY POSTING ON TAMMY EDWARDS, TAYLOR EDWARDS; POSTED ON 02/10/16 WITH FEES OF $100.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON APPLICATION FOR POSTING AND MAILING GRANTED AND FILED WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $20.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/05/2016
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER TO POST SUMMONS & COMPLAINT FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160205-1893 $20.00; 160205-1893-CK Reference Number 515939

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $40.16.--BEGINNING ON 02/01/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-1798 $255.00; 160201-1798-CK Reference Number 515751

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less