This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 05:41:03 (UTC).

ALLEN STORM-V-GHASSAN NASSAR

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 ALLEN STORM-V-GHASSAN NASSAR was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1692

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ALLEN STORM

Defendant

GHASSAN NASSAR

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: DENIED

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ALLEN STORM PRESENT; DEFENDANT GHASSAN NASSAR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:33; WITNESS -- ALLEN STORM IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- GHASSAN NASSAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ALLEN STORM'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TO HAVE COUNSEL PRESENT IS DENIED.; COURT FINDS:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ALLEN STORM ORDERED ENTERED 11/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT GHASSAN NASSAR; AND AGAINST ALLEN STORM; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER/ATTACHMENTS FILED AS TO GHASSAN NASSAR. PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER/ATTACHMENTS FILED AS TO GHASSAN NASSAR. PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/08/2027
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 11/08/27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/09/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; DENISE TRAGER DVORAK, JUDGE; CLERK: DIANA ROBLES; BAILIFF: E BARELA; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF ALLEN STORM PRESENT; DEFENDANT GHASSAN NASSAR PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING.; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:33; WITNESS -- ALLEN STORM IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- GHASSAN NASSAR IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; ALLEN STORM'S MOTION TO CONTINUE TO HAVE COUNSEL PRESENT IS DENIED.; COURT FINDS:; PLAINTIFF HAS THE BURDEN TO PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES BY A PREPONDERANCE OF THE EVIDENCE. PLAINTIFF FAILED TO MEET THE BURDEN AND DID NOT; PROVE A CAUSE OF ACTION AND/OR DAMAGES ON WHICH A JUDGMENT COULD BE AWARDED. JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT.; JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (IMAGED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF ALLEN STORM ORDERED ENTERED 11/06/17; JUDGMENT FOR DEFENDANT GHASSAN NASSAR; AND AGAINST ALLEN STORM; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER/ATTACHMENTS FILED AS TO GHASSAN NASSAR. PARTY SERVED ON 10/10/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ALLEN STORM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALLEN STORM IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALLEN STORM FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$5,000 <$10,000(IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less