This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/02/2018 at 13:11:43 (UTC).

ALFARO -V- RUIZ

Case Summary

On 02/24/2017 ALFARO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RUIZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0417

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OMAR ALFARO

Defendant

DEBBIE RUIZ

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES

474 West Orange Show Road

San Bernardino, CA 92408

LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE

474 W Orange Show Rd.

San Bernardino, CA 92408

 

Court Documents

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/24/2017 OF OMAR ALFARO GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: OMAR ALFARO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEBBIE RUIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $960.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,460.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR OMAR ALFARO.

SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR OMAR ALFARO.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; Disposition: DENIED

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT; Disposition: DENIED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:54; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: E. BARELA; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LUKE SINKINSON PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT DEBBIE RUIZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; DEBBIE RUIZ'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT IS HEARD.; PLAINTIFF INDICATES THEY WERE NOT NOTIFIED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF .; NOTICE WAS GIVEN TO PLAINTIFF NOT PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL.; NO RESPONSIVE PLEADING IS ATTACHED TO MOTION; COUNSEL REQUESTS MOTION BE DISMISSED.; ORAL ARGUMENT PRESENTED BY DEBBIE RUIZ .; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; COURT FINDS:; DEBBIE RUIZ'S MOTION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT IS DENIED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT TO BE HEARD ON 03/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.

EX-PARTE MOTION RE: TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT TO BE HEARD ON 03/29/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT B1X.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170314-0015 $25.00; 170314-0015-CK Reference Number 1168596

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/24/2017 OF OMAR ALFARO ORDERED ENTERED 03/13/17; JUDGMENT FOR: OMAR ALFARO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEBBIE RUIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: DEBBIE RUIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DEBBIE RUIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DEBBIE RUIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/28/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/28/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DEBBIE RUIZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/28/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DEBBIE RUIZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 02/28/17

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170224-0045 $255.00; 170224-0045-CK Reference Number 1167297

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/24/2017 OF OMAR ALFARO GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: OMAR ALFARO; JUDGMENT AGAINST: DEBBIE RUIZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $500.00 AND DAMAGES $960.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $1,460.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 03/30/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $500.00, ATTORNEY FEES $0.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED; SUBSTITUTING H.G. LONG & ASSOCIATES WITH LAW OFFICE OF JOHNE BOUZANE AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD FOR OMAR ALFARO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION REGARDING EX-PARTE NOTICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 03/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON DEBBIE RUIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/24/2017 OF OMAR ALFARO AS TO DEBBIE RUIZ, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/28/17 WITH FEES OF $75.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DEBBIE RUIZ; PARTY SERVED ON 02/28/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $75.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/24/2017 OF OMAR ALFARO, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 02/11/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170224-0045 $255.00; 170224-0045-CK Reference Number 1167297

    Read MoreRead Less