This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 20:32:22 (UTC).

ALEXIS R MILTON -V- EDRIC D MILTON

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 ALEXIS R MILTON filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against EDRIC D MILTON. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********3727

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEXIS R MILTON

Respondent

EDRIC D MILTON

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON EDRIC D MILTON; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 08/23/17 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2017
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 170920-0289 $9.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ALEXIS R MILTON RE: CC,CV,CS (121416); Disposition: Dismissed; Minutes; MICHAEL BISHAY, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: EILEEN CHRISTIANSEN; COURT REPORTER WENDY LUCERO 11855; BAILIFF: K CANNON; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; REQUEST FOR ORDER HELD.; REQUEST FOR ORDER DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE; PARTIES FAILED TO APPEAR; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ALEXIS R MILTON FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $90.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ALEXIS R MILTON IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ALEXIS R MILTON

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR ORDER FILED BY ALEXIS R MILTON RE: CC,CV,CS (121416).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ALEXIS R MILTON.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V14

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.