This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/10/2018 at 10:54:45 (UTC).

ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH -N- RHEGAN OLIVIA LIMBAUGH

Case Summary

On 06/07/2017 ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH -N- RHEGAN OLIVIA LIMBAUGH was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Victorville District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1732

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Victorville District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH

Respondent

RHEGAN OLIVIA LIMBAUGH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

MARTELL, NICHOLAS A

15800 Main Street Suite 130

Hesperia, CA 92345

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/31/2017
  • NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY FILED. NICHOLAS A MARTELL WITHDRAWS AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD. ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH IS NOW REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2017
  • PARTY ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH UPDATED: PTNR ADRS-NTC OF W/DRWL FILED-PTNR NOW PRO PER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 12/12/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/07/2017 OF ALEXANDER LIMBAUGH FILED; Minutes; FAMILY LAW JUDGMENT ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/07/2017 OF ALEXANDER LIMBAUGH ORDERED ENTERED 08/24/17; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION -- JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); DISPOSITION: JUDGMENT BEFORE HEARING. (FL); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT OR UNCONTESTED DISSOLUTION FILED ON 08/24/17 BY ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • STIPULATION AND WAIVER OF FINAL DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST RHEGAN OLIVIA LIMBAUGH FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE WITH CHILDREN FILED 06/07/2017 OF ALEXANDER LIMBAUGH AS TO RHEGAN OLIVIA LIMBAUGH.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2017
  • DECLARATION REGARDING SERVICE OF DECLARATION OF DISCLOSURE AND INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY ALEXANDER B LIMBAUGH FOR PRELIMINRY, FINAL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2017
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON RHEGAN OLIVIA LIMBAUGH; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 06/11/17 WITH COSTS OF $111.20 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • DECLARATION UNDER UCCJEA FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170607-0471 $435.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT V12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2017
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.