This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 21:30:53 (UTC).

ALBERTO TOVAR

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 ALBERTO TOVAR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0964

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ANGELICA SAUCEDO

Decedent

ALBERTO TOVAR

 

Court Documents

HRG OF 02/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 02/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELICA SAUCEDO

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELICA SAUCEDO

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

MAILING COVERSHEET 12/20/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

MAILING COVERSHEET 12/20/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2018
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL OF PTN FOR LETTERS; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JUDGE PRO TEM DONNASUE ORTIZ; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D RICE; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; ON PETITION FOR PROBATE FILED 09/27/2017 OF ANGELICA SAUCEDO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING HELD (PROBATE).; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.; COMPLAINT STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); DISPOSITION ENTRY COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL BEFORE TRIAL (PROBATE); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2018
  • HRG OF 02/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 02/07/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MAILING COVERSHEET 12/20/17 MINUTE ORDR (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • HEARING RE: PETITION FOR LETTERS OF ADMIN. W/ FULL AUTHORITY UNDER IAEA.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JAMES MICHAEL WELCH, JUDGE; CLERK: RACHELE ANDREWS; COURT REPORTER CATHY ALBRITTON 7137; COURT ATTENDANT D NEWCOMB; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); MATTER IS CONTINUED FOR NON APPEARANCE AND; OSC RE DISMISSAL.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE DISMISSAL OF PTN FOR LETTERS SET FOR 02/07/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S36P.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL 12/20/17 MINUTE ORDER TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • HRG OF 12/20/17 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY ANGELICA SAUCEDO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY ANGELICA SAUCEDO IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON ANGELICA SAUCEDO FOR PETITION AND COURT REPORTER IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ANGELICA SAUCEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON APPOINTING ADMINISTRATOR RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION RE: LETTERS OF ADMINISTRATION WITH FULL IAEA FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less