This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 00:42:49 (UTC).

AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA -N- ANGELICA GAYTAN-REYE

Case Summary

On 12/14/2016 AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA -N- ANGELICA GAYTAN-REYE was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0512

  • Filing Date:

    12/14/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA

Respondent

ANGELICA GAYTAN-REYES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available online for Family cases in California.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/29/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180329-0352 $17.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • VACATE NFF2 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 04/17/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT FWSF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • FEES ON FEE WAIVER ORDER OF 01/17/17 FOR DOCUMENT FILING FEES (435) PAID IN FULL BY AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2017
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR INSTALLMENT PAYMENT PAID BY AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA IN THE AMOUNT OF $348.00.; Minutes; Receipt: 170327-0943 $348.00; 170327-0943-MC Reference Number 031-0010556865

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • VACATE NFF2 HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 02/24/17 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT FWSF.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2017
  • PAYMENT ON FEE WAIVER FOR 87.00 PAID BY AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA IN THE AMOUNT OF $87.00.; Minutes; Receipt: 170217-0434 $87.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: FEE WAIVER ADVISAL LETTER RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE (AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2017
  • NOTICE OF FEE WAIVER ADVISAL LETTER SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT THE COURT ORDERED PAYMENTSON YOUR CASE IN THE AMOUNT OF $43.50 PER; MONTH. AS OF TODAY THE COURT HAS NOT RECEIVED YOUR PAYMENT. PLEASE POST YOUR PAYMENT OF; $43.50 BY 02/24/16. FAILURE TO POST YOUR PAYMENT BY 02/24/16 MAY RESULT IN THE; DISMISSAL OF YOUR FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT -- DATE MARITAL STATUS TERMINATES 06/15/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2017
  • NEJ MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2017
  • HEARING RE: FEE WAIVER REQUEST. ($435) AILEN HERNANDEZ-HERRERA; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; DEBORAH A DANIEL, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: CHRISTINA SMITH; COURT REPORTER CHERYL ORTEGA 13709; BAILIFF: C J SANCHEZ; APPEARANCES:; PETITIONER AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; WITNESS -- AILEN Y. HERNANDEZ-HERRERA IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; THE COURT INQUIRES OF APPLICANT REGARDING HIS/HER ABILITY TO PAY FILING FEES.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; AFTER REVIEW OF THE APPLICATION AND/OR INQUIRY OF THE APPLICANT, THE COURT DENIES THE REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES AND ALLOWS MONTHLY PAYMENTS, SEE ORDER IN FILE FOR PAYMENT INFORMATION.; ORDER SIGNED THIS DATE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2016
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON ANGELICA GAYTAN-REYES; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 12/14/16 WITH COSTS OF $0.00 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER DENIED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW SUMMONS ISSUED - ORIGINAL FILED IN COURT FILE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • COMMUNITY AND QUASI COMMUNITY PROPERTY DECLARATION OF AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • INCOME AND EXPENSE DECLARATION FILED BY AILEN Y HERNANDEZ-HERRERA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S52

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2016
  • FAMILY LAW CASE INITIATED AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED.

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.