This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 18:23:37 (UTC).

AHN VS VELASCO

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 AHN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against VELASCO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********7499

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MICHAEL JAY AHN

Defendant

MARCO VELASCO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MARCO VELASCO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MARCO VELASCO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JUDGE MICHAEL CAMBER; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL JAY AHN PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; MARCO VELASCO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- MICHAEL JAY AHN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARCO VELASCO.; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL JAY AHN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARCO VELASCO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,000.00; 10:35; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/04/2017
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT RETURNED WITH FWD ADDRESS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 11/21/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/21/2017
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JUDGE MICHAEL CAMBER; CLERK: KRISTIN CORNETT; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF MICHAEL JAY AHN PRESENT; DEFENDANT NOT PRESENT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:32; MARCO VELASCO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- MICHAEL JAY AHN IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; COURT FINDS:; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MARCO VELASCO.; JUDGMENT FOR: MICHAEL JAY AHN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARCO VELASCO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,000.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,000.00; 10:35; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ACTION - COMPLETE; ; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SC100 FILED AS TO MARCO VELASCO. PARTY SERVED ON 10/13/17. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $40.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL JAY AHN IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MICHAEL JAY AHN FOR NEW FILING IN THE AMOUNT OF $30.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MICHAEL JAY AHN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less