This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 08:29:58 (UTC).

AGUILAR -V- NERAM VILLAGE

Case Summary

On 10/04/2017 AGUILAR -V- NERAM VILLAGE was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9488

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

TEODORA AGUILAR

Defendants

NILTON J. ANAYA SALCEDO

NERAM VILLAGE, INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

L.A. INJURY ATTORNEYS

1611 N San Francisco Blvd

Burbank, CA 91504

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/06/2019
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2018
  • ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/03/2018
  • NOTICE OF CONTINUED STATUS HEARING RE:BANKRUPTCY FILED BY TEODORA AGUILAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; GILBERT OCHOA, JUDGE; CLERK: KIMBERLY REYNOLDS; COURT REPORTER ALICIA S. VASQUEZ 12225; COURT ATTENDANT L BRUCK; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY KARINA A. PADUA APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR TEODORA AGUILAR.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; HEARINGS:; VACATE OSCX HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 08/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 06/06/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S33.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY HEARING SENT.; Minutes; PLEASE BE ADVISED THAT A STATUS OF BANKRUPTCY HEARING IS SCHEDULED FOR 06/25/18 AT 8:30AM IN; DEPARTMENT S33.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY FILED BY NILTON J. ANAYA SALCEDO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • UPDATE DISPOSITION OF NILTON J. ANAYA SALCEDO TO BANKRUPT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY PETITION AND STAY FILED BY NILTON J. ANAYA SALCEDO; BANKRUPTCY CASE NUMBER IS 6:18-10090-WJ. (ENTIRE CASE STAYED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 10/04/2017 OF TEODORA AGUILAR AS TO NERAM VILLAGE, INC..

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2018
  • REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST NERAM VILLAGE, INC. FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2018
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2018
  • 2 PROOF OF SERVICE IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): COURT REQUIRES THE ORIGINAL SIGNED PROOFS OR INDICATE THEY ARE A FAX FILING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • PLAINTIFF TEODORA AGUILAR FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S33

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY TEODORA AGUILAR FOR 1ST APP FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 171004-0633 $435.00; 171004-0633-CK Reference Number CK 447967

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less