This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 07/03/2018 at 04:57:05 (UTC).

AGUILAR -V- HUENNEKENS

Case Summary

On 07/14/2017 AGUILAR filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against HUENNEKENS. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1624

  • Filing Date:

    07/14/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Barstow District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHN AGUILAR

Defendant

JODY HUENNEKENS

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MOTLAGH, NILUFAR ALEMOZAFFAR

714 West Olympic Blvd #753

Los Angeles, CA 90015

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170814-0564 $25.00; 170814-0564-CK Reference Number 12608

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF JOHN AGUILAR ORDERED ENTERED 08/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN AGUILAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/25/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/25/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JODY HUENNEKENS SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JODY HUENNEKENS SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JODY HUENNEKENS SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO JODY HUENNEKENS SERVED ON 07/25/17 WITH COSTS OF $75.00 FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0862 $255.00; 170714-0862-CK Reference Number 14141

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170814-0564 $25.00; 170814-0564-CK Reference Number 12608

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • VACATE SCUD HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 09/05/17 AT 09:00 IN DEPARTMENT B3X.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF JOHN AGUILAR ORDERED ENTERED 08/14/17; JUDGMENT FOR: JOHN AGUILAR; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/14/2017 OF JOHN AGUILAR AS TO JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JODY HUENNEKENS, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/14/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 07/25/17 WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 07/26/2017
  • NOTICE OF FILING OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER ACTION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC TO DEFENDANT OF FILING (ALL UNKNOWNS) RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • RETURN MAIL: NTC TO DEFENDANT OF FILING (JODY HUENNEKENS) RECEIVED BACK FROM POST OFFICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,200.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $20.00.--BEGINNING ON 07/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/14/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170714-0862 $255.00; 170714-0862-CK Reference Number 14141

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.