This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 13:21:44 (UTC).

AGUILAR-V-GAMBOA

Case Summary

On 10/30/2017 AGUILAR-V-GAMBOA was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1455

  • Filing Date:

    10/30/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

KEVIN SPRUELL

MONICA AGUILAR

Defendants

DAVID NIZNIK

MERCURY INSURANCE

DENISE GAMBOA

Minor

ISABELLA SPRUELL

 

Court Documents

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER -PER COURTROOM NO ACTION TO BE TAKEN RE: FIRST APPEARANCE/FEE WAIVER FILED

ORDER -PER COURTROOM NO ACTION TO BE TAKEN RE: FIRST APPEARANCE/FEE WAIVER FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/30/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2018
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER REGINA VEGA 12612; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR OSC RE DISMISSAL.; 08:34; HALL CALLED FOR PLAINTIFFS MONICA AGUILAR, KEVIN SPRUELL, AND ISABELLA SPRUELL.; NO RESPONSE.; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: FAILURE TO APPEAR / FAILURE TO PROSECUTE.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSCECUTION BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MINUTE ORDER DATED 5/30/18 TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2018
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; BRIAN S MCCARVILLE, JUDGE; CLERK: ERIN MUELLER; COURT REPORTER DEENA MACIAS 9826; COURT ATTENDANT S CARR; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ACTION CAME ON FOR TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE.; COURT NOTES NO APPEARANCE BY PLAINTIFFS.; HALL CALLED FOR MONICA AGUILAR, KEVIN SPRUELL; AND ISABELLA SPRUELL.; NO RESPONSE.; COURT SETS MATTER FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL.; HEARINGS:; ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: DISMISSAL SET FOR 05/30/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S30; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2018
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 180117-0925 $2.50; 180117-0925-CK Reference Number 185019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/05/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER -PER COURTROOM NO ACTION TO BE TAKEN RE: FIRST APPEARANCE/FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR FURTHER ACTION/COURT ORDER RE: FIRST APPEARANCE FEES RE:KEVIN SPRUELL SENT DEPARTMENT S30 FOR REVIEW.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY MONICA AGUILAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY MONICA AGUILAR IS GRANTED; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON MONICA AGUILAR FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • NO SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/30/2017
  • FILING FEES OF $435.00 DUE TO THE COURT ON OR BEFORE 11/20/17. IF A HEARING HAS BEEN SET, YOU MUST SUBMIT THE FEES ONE DAY PRIOR TO THE HEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less