This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 05/04/2021 at 22:01:15 (UTC).

AETCO, INC.-V-U.S. DUTY GEAR, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2020 AETCO, INC -V-U S DUTY GEAR, INC was filed as a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Pacheco, John M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2765

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

Judge Details

Judge

Pacheco, John M

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

AETCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

TAYLOR, ALAN

Defendants

U.S. DUTY GEAR, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

WIGGS, CARLOS

FLORES, ESTELA

FLORES, JOSE LUIS

Does 1 through 30

FLORES, ANGEL

Not Yet Classified

CONV

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BROWN & BROWN

Attorney at Brown & Brown

1152 N Mountain Avenue Suite 210

Upland, CA 91786

Defendant Attorney

Herring, Conrad Christian

 

Court Documents

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

04/26/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

04/26/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

04/26/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

**CV - Portal Minute Order

04/26/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Opposition to Motion Filed

04/06/2021: Opposition to Motion Filed

Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

03/25/2021: Filing Fees Due to the Court on or Before

Amended Complaint Filed

03/24/2021: Amended Complaint Filed

Proof of Service Filed

03/23/2021: Proof of Service Filed

Declaration Filed

03/23/2021: Declaration Filed

Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

03/23/2021: Memorandum of Points & Authorities Filed

Demurrer Filed

03/23/2021: Demurrer Filed

Notice Returning Documents

03/19/2021: Notice Returning Documents

Notice of Ruling Filed

03/17/2021: Notice of Ruling Filed

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

01/29/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

01/29/2021: CSG - Correspondence Coversheet Generated to Mail to Counsel of Record

**CV - Portal Minute Order

01/29/2021: **CV - Portal Minute Order

Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

01/28/2021: Initial Trial Setting Conference Order Signed and Filed

Notice of Hearing Filed

11/20/2020: Notice of Hearing Filed

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketFurther Trial Setting Conference; Judicial Officer: Pacheco, John M; Hearing Time: 8:30 AM; Comment: Mediation Completion/Further TSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2021
  • DocketVoluntary Civil Mediation Session; Hearing Time: 1:30 PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCorrespondence Coversheet Generated to Mail:; Comment: 4/26/21 minute order/court's ruling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketRemote hearing held; Comment: Remote hearing held pursuant to Judicial Council Emergency Rule of Court 3(a)(3).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketLeave of Court Granted for; Comment: 30 days leave to file 2nd amended complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDemurrer; Judicial Officer: Pacheco, John M; Hearing Time: 9:00 AM; Result: Held

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialAETCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Fax Filing; Receipt # SC-2021-17214; AETCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; $11.27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • FinancialAETCO, INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION; Transaction Assessment; $11.27

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: $11.27 CC paid on 04/06/21 for fax, copies,mailing/postge

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOpposition to Motion Filed; Comment: to demurrer to pla's complaint

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
77 More Docket Entries
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY AETCO, INC., ALAN TAYLOR FOR COPIES AND POSTAGE 200713-0057-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.55 PAYMT 200713-0057-VS TSB/ 0.02 FCP/ 1.00 PAYMT 200713-0057-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0025251470

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY AETCO, INC., ALAN TAYLOR FOR POSTAGE 200713-0046-VS FFS/ 0.20 FPC/ 0.55 PAYMT 200713-0046-VS TSB/ 0.02 PAYMT 200713-0046-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0025251470

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketFiling Fee Paid by; Comment: FILING FEE PAID BY AETCO, INC., ALAN TAYLOR FOR FIRST APPEARANCE FEE 200713-0043-VS CVH/ 435.00 PAYMT 200713-0043-VS REFERENCE NUMBER 035-0025251470

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff First Paper Fee Previously Paid in Full; Comment: PLAINTIFF AETCO, INC., ALAN TAYLOR FIRST PAPER FEE PREVIOUSLY PAID IN FULL.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCertificate of Assignment Received; Comment: CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNotice Imaged; Comment: NOTICE IMAGED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • DocketCase Assigned for All Purposes; Comment: CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Filed; Comment: CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSummons Issued and Filed; Comment: SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketComplaint and Party Information Entered; Comment: COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONV is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERRING CONRAD ATTORNEY AT LAW