This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 11/25/2018 at 01:56:00 (UTC).

ADVANCED VS THIEL

Case Summary

On 08/19/2010 ADVANCED filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against THIEL. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2159

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2010

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Rancho Cucamonga District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC

Defendant

BRIAN THIEL

 

Court Documents

OBJECTION TO ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFENDANT (IMAGED)

OBJECTION TO ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFENDANT (IMAGED)

DEF BRIAN THIELS OBJECTION TO ORDER OF EXAMINATION IN VIOLATION OF CCP 708.160 FILED. (IMAGED)

DEF BRIAN THIELS OBJECTION TO ORDER OF EXAMINATION IN VIOLATION OF CCP 708.160 FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110426-2067 $40.00

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED)

APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110214-1869 $40.00

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC FILED. (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS GRANTED & HRG CONTINUED TO 12/15/10. (IMAGED)

ORDER ON REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER - FILED. REQUEST IS GRANTED & HRG CONTINUED TO 12/15/10. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY BRIAN THIEL. (IMAGED)

REQUEST FOR COURT ORDER AND ANSWER FILED BY BRIAN THIEL. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BRIAN THIEL. PARTY SERVED ON 09/08/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO BRIAN THIEL. PARTY SERVED ON 09/08/10. TYPE OF SERVICE IS PERSONAL. WITH FEES OF $30.00. (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC FILED. (IMAGED)

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100819-3353 $50.00; 100819-3353-CK Reference Number 3529

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2011
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; CHARLES M FUERTSCH, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC, BRIAN THIEL; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCES; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • OBJECTION TO ORDER OF EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFENDANT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • OBJECTION TO ORAP HRG RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • DEF BRIAN THIELS OBJECTION TO ORDER OF EXAMINATION IN VIOLATION OF CCP 708.160 FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110426-2067 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2011
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 110426-2044 $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2011
  • ORAP -- EXAMINATION OF JUDGMENT DEBTOR; Disposition: Off Calendar; Minutes; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE PRO TEM; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: F NIETO; APPEARANCES:; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC, BRIAN THIEL; PROCEEDINGS:; POST DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; OFF-CALENDAR. REASON: NO APPEARANCES OR SERVICE; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2011
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $100.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $110.30), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2011
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR ORDER FOR EXAMINATION FILED. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 110214-1869 $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/12/2011
  • EXHIBITS RELEASED TO RANDY ANDERSON

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF ADVANCED POWER SYSTEMS INC FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2010
  • CLERKS NOTICE OF VENUE CHALLENGE MAILED TO PARTIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • IMAGED DOCUMENTS PREVIOUSLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2010
  • DEFENDANTS OBJECTION TO VENUE IN SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F2R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • DECLARATION OF NON-MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/19/2010
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 100819-3353 $50.00; 100819-3353-CK Reference Number 3529

    Read MoreRead Less