This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:46:32 (UTC).

ADEMORIJIMI-V-24 HOUR FITNESS

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ADEMORIJIMI-V-24 HOUR FITNESS was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0966

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

FESTUS ADEMORIJIMI

ADEYINKA ADEMORIJIMI

Defendant

24 HOUR FITNESS

 

Court Documents

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF 24 HOUR FITNESS FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF 24 HOUR FITNESS FILED.

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0395 $65.00; 160201-0395-EZ Reference Number 79T402106R431230

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO 24 HOUR FITNESS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO 24 HOUR FITNESS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL. (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2017
  • CASE IS DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GOVERNMENT CODE 68152 TO 68153 ON 05/04/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL FILED- WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF 24 HOUR FITNESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: REQ FOR DSMSL AFTER COURT ORD ARB BEFORE TRIAL (CI; Minutes; NOT REPORTED; DAVID A WILLIAMS, JUDGE; CLERK: JERI MILLER; BAILIFF: D FERRIS; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF FESTUS ADEMORIJIMI PRESENT; 24 HOUR FITNESS REPRESENTED BY MARSHALL MARQUARDT.; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; SMALL CLAIMS REFERRAL TO MEDIATION; ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: DISMISSAL FILED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION (SC); DISPOSITION: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL AFTER MEDIATION (SC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF 24 HOUR FITNESS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FILED AS TO 24 HOUR FITNESS; PARTY SERVED ON 02/05/16 BY CERTIFIED MAIL. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2016
  • POS RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • TRACKING # 9590 9402 1260 5246 9626 36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • E PAYMENT TRANSACTION NUMBER 79T402106R431230C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160201-0395 $65.00; 160201-0395-EZ Reference Number 79T402106R431230

    Read MoreRead Less