Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/03/2018 at 08:16:17 (UTC).

ADELANTO SPRINGS-V-KATHERINE TAYLOR

Case Summary

On 08/03/2017 ADELANTO SPRINGS-V-KATHERINE TAYLOR was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1890

  • Filing Date:

    08/03/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P.

Defendant

KATHERINE TAYLOR

Other

ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELAINE S. ASHTON

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/03/2017 OF ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P. GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHERINE TAYLOR; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $653.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $805.12.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,433.12; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $125.00.

DECLARATION RE: RE OWNERSHIP FILED BY ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P.

DECLARATION RE: RE OWNERSHIP FILED BY ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P.

COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT * PLACED IN FILE

COPY OF LEASE AGREEMENT * PLACED IN FILE

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( POSSESSION); Minutes; Receipt: 170818-0529 $25.00; 170818-0529-CK Reference Number 537175

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 08/03/2017 OF ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P. ORDERED ENTERED 08/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHERINE TAYLOR, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: KATHERINE TAYLOR, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KATHERINE TAYLOR, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON KATHERINE TAYLOR, ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 08/07/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 08/07/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KATHERINE TAYLOR; PARTY SERVED ON 08/07/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KATHERINE TAYLOR; PARTY SERVED ON 08/07/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170803-0832 $255.00; 170803-0832-CK Reference Number 5121

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION & ORDER RE: LOST ORIGINALS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/03/2017 OF ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P. GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: KATHERINE TAYLOR; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $653.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $400.00 COSTS $575.00 AND DAMAGES $805.12.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,433.12; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • 585 JUDGMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE END DATE 09/06/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT REQUESTED WITH COSTS OF $575.00, ATTORNEY FEES $400.00, COMMERCIAL/COVENANTS/OTHER IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER WORKSHEET PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 08/18/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS ON 08/07/17 WITH FEES OF $85.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON KATHERINE TAYLOR; PARTY SERVED ON 08/07/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $85.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/08/2017
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 08/03/2017 OF ADELANTO SPRINGS VILLAGE L.P., ALL UNNAMED OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $653.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $21.76.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170803-0832 $255.00; 170803-0832-CK Reference Number 5121

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT B3X

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S