This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/08/2018 at 06:07:00 (UTC).

ACUMEN -V- KHELA/MARTINEZ

Case Summary

On 07/11/2017 ACUMEN -V- KHELA/MARTINEZ was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4693

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AEONS ACUMEN

Defendants

JODH KHELA

DANIELA MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAM E. WINDHAM

P.O.Box 2008

Beaumont, CA 92223

 

Court Documents

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DANIELA MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DANIELA MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF AEONS ACUMEN ORDERED ENTERED 07/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AEONS ACUMEN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0707 $255.00; 170717-0707-CK Reference Number 6201

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JODH KHELA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JODH KHELA; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 07/11/17

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170720-0274 $25.00; 170720-0274-CK Reference Number 5707

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/11/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170720-0274 $25.00; 170720-0274-CK Reference Number 5707

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DEFAULT PACKET RECEIVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • 1169 IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): PREMISE ADDRESS DOES NOT MATCH COURT RECORDS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF AEONS ACUMEN ORDERED ENTERED 07/18/17; JUDGMENT FOR: AEONS ACUMEN; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 07/11/2017 OF AEONS ACUMEN AS TO JODH KHELA, DANIELA MARTINEZ.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON JODH KHELA; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON DANIELA MARTINEZ; PARTY SERVED ON 07/11/17 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $1,150.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $38.33.--BEGINNING ON 08/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170717-0707 $255.00; 170717-0707-CK Reference Number 6201

    Read MoreRead Less