This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/14/2019 at 11:49:02 (UTC).

ACOSTA-V-AGUILAR

Case Summary

On 11/02/2018 ACOSTA-V-AGUILAR was filed as a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********8745

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSE ACOSTA

VERONICA ACOSTA

Defendants and Cross Defendants

SALVADOR GARCIA AGUILAR

XTRA LEASE, LLC

JUAN TAFOLLA

CC EXPRESS INC

CC XPRESS, INC.

Cross Plaintiff

XTRA LEASE LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BANAFSHEH DANESH &JAVID PC

9701 Wilshire Blvd 12Th Floor

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorneys

MURCHISON & CUMMING LLP

801 South Grand Ave 9Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

TRACHTMAN & TRACHTMAN

19732 Macarthur Bl Ste 100

Irvine, CA 92612

SNYDER BURNETT EGERER LLP

5383 Hollister Ave Suite 240

Santa Barbara, CA 93111

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VERONICA ACOSTA.

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VERONICA ACOSTA.

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/02/2018 OF VERONICA ACOSTA BY XTRA LEASE, LLC

CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/02/2018 OF VERONICA ACOSTA BY XTRA LEASE, LLC

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SALVADOR GARCIA AGUILAR, JUAN TAFOLLA, CC EXPRESS INC

AT-ISSUE MEMORANDUM FILED BY SALVADOR GARCIA AGUILAR, JUAN TAFOLLA, CC EXPRESS INC

NOTICE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

NOTICE SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/02/2018 OF VERONICA ACOSTA AS TO XTRA LEASE, LLC ADDING ATTORNEY TRACHTMAN & TRACHTMAN FILED

NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL ON THE COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 11/02/2018 OF VERONICA ACOSTA AS TO XTRA LEASE, LLC ADDING ATTORNEY TRACHTMAN & TRACHTMAN FILED

ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR GARCIA AGUILAR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY SALVADOR GARCIA AGUILAR; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY JUAN TAFOLLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY JUAN TAFOLLA; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY CC EXPRESS INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY CC EXPRESS INC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY MURCHISON & CUMMINGLLP.

ANSWER FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER BURNETT EGERER LLP.

ANSWER FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER BURNETT EGERER LLP.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERONICA ACOSTA, JOSE ACOSTA.

NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERONICA ACOSTA, JOSE ACOSTA.

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 181102-0820 $435.00; 181102-0820-CK Reference Number 45031

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/02/2019
  • OSC RE: DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2019
  • REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECD VIA TURBO COURT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): ATTORNEY ON EACH COMPLAINT MUST SIGN FOR AN ENTIRE ACTIO.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/25/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • VACATE TSCCV HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 07/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT OF ENTIRE ACTION FILED BY VERONICA ACOSTA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT RE: ORAL PROCEEDINGS 050219 FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY LAUREN HORWITZ PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; ATTORNEY PAUL FLAHERTY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANTS AGUILAR, TAFOLLA, CC EXPRESS.; ATTORNEY JOHN RODDY PRESENT FOR DEFENDANT XTRA LEASE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ATTORNEY FLAHERTY INFORMS THE COURT THAT THEY HAVE RECENTLY FILED A CROSS COMPLAINT. THEY WILL; BE ADDING ANOTHER NAME TO THE CROSS COMPLAINT BUT ARE WAITING ON VERIFICATION FROM THEIR CLIENT.; HEARINGS:; TRIAL SETTING CONFERENCE SET FOR 07/25/19 AT 08:30 IN DEPT. S29; PARTIES PRESENT WAIVE NOTICE. ATTORNEY FLAHERTY TO GIVE NOTICE TO NEW PARTY.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF CROSS-COMPLAINT FILED AS TO SALVADOR GARCIA AGUILAR, JUAN TAFOLLA, CC XPRESS, INC.. PARTY SERVED ON 05/01/19. TYPE OF SERVICE IS MAIL. WITH FEES OF $0.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY XTRA LEASE, LLC; PARTY REPRESENTED BY SNYDER BURNETT EGERER LLP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/12/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY XTRA LEASE, LLC FOR FIRST APPEARANCE, COPY, PSTG/EVLP, FAX; Minutes; Receipt: 181212-0862 $443.22; 181212-0862-VS Reference Number 712174

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF POSTING JURY FEES FILED BY VERONICA ACOSTA, JOSE ACOSTA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • ADVANCED JURY FEES POSTED FOR VERONICA ACOSTA, JOSE ACOSTA.; Minutes; Receipt: 181102-0828 $150.00; 181102-0828-CK Reference Number 45031/45032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED; Minutes; Receipt: 181102-0820 $435.00; 181102-0820-CK Reference Number 45031

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2018
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.