This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/03/2018 at 11:51:25 (UTC).

ACHEAMPONG-V-KHODABAKHSH

Case Summary

On 02/01/2016 ACHEAMPONG-V-KHODABAKHSH was filed as a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0988

  • Filing Date:

    02/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OPOKU ACHEAMPONG

Defendant

MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH

 

Court Documents

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-2082 $55.00; 160201-2082-CK Reference Number 657

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH. (IMAGED)

MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160426-0545 $20.00

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED

MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:56; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG PRESENT; DEFENDANT MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH'S MOTION TO VACATE IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH'S MOTION TO VACATE IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 02/01/2016 OF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 02/01/2016 OF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG ORDERED SET ASIDE.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- OPOKU ACHEAMPONG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 11:11; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ******************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NOT PROPER DEFENDANT.; EVIDENCE SHOWED MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH NOT THE PROPER DEFENDANT BASED IN PLAINTIFFS CAUSE OF; ACTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY PARTIES WITH RULING

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:11; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- OPOKU ACHEAMPONG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH.; JUDGMENT FOR 05/16/16.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 05/16/16; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,595.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:14; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH. PARTY SERVED ON 03/24/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH. PARTY SERVED ON 03/24/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL NOTICE OF RULING ON MOTION TO VACATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:56; CARLOS CABRERA, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG PRESENT; DEFENDANT MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH'S MOTION TO VACATE IS HEARD.; WITNESS -- MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH'S MOTION TO VACATE IS GRANTED.; SET ASIDE ENTIRE JUDGMENT ON CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 02/01/2016 OF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG.; SET ASIDE CASE DISPOSITION; DISPOSITION OF CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF FILED 02/01/2016 OF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG ORDERED SET ASIDE.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- OPOKU ACHEAMPONG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; WITNESS -- MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; MATTER DEEMED SUBMITTED.; 11:11; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.; ******************************; COURT RULES AS FOLLOWS ON SUBMITTED MATTER:; ON COURTS MOTION, CASE ORDERED DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO ENTIRE ACTION. REASON: NOT PROPER DEFENDANT.; EVIDENCE SHOWED MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH NOT THE PROPER DEFENDANT BASED IN PLAINTIFFS CAUSE OF; ACTION.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); DISPOSITION: COURT ORDERED DISMISSAL - LACK OF PROSECUTION (SC); CLERK'S OFFICE TO NOTIFY PARTIES WITH RULING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 04/28/16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL MOTION TO VACATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO VACATE JUDGMENT FILED BY MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH. (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 160426-0545 $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 10:11; JOEL AGRON, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; WITNESS -- OPOKU ACHEAMPONG IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH.; JUDGMENT FOR 05/16/16.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: 05/16/16; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $4,500.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $95.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $4,595.00; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); 10:14; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM FILED AS TO MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH. PARTY SERVED ON 03/24/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED. WITH FEES OF $40.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2016
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; NOT RECORDED; LILY L SINFIELD, JUDGE; CLERK: SUSAN KING; BAILIFF: R HAZARD; APPEARANCES:; PLAINTIFF OPOKU ACHEAMPONG PRESENT; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: MOHAMMED KHODABAKHSH; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; HEARING CONTINUED AT REQUEST OF PLAINTIFF.; REASON: NEED SERVICE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 04/26/16 AT 10:00 IN DEPARTMENT F8.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF >$1,500 <$5,000 FILED; Minutes; Receipt: 160201-2082 $55.00; 160201-2082-CK Reference Number 657

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO F8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less