Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 04/27/2019 at 19:01:34 (UTC).

ACCURATE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT-V-SAMPLES

Case Summary

On 02/06/2019 ACCURATE INVESTMENT MANAGEMENT-V-SAMPLES was filed as a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Joshua Tree District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0044

  • Filing Date:

    02/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Joshua Tree District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ACCURATE MANGEMENT INVESTMENT

Defendant

TERESA SAMPLES

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HARLAN L BRANSKY C/O EDWARD MONTGOME

Po Box 2394

Yucca Valley, CA 92286

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT FILED

JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT ORDERED ENTERED 03/25/19; JUDGMENT FOR: ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TERESA SAMPLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN OVER COUNTER ON 03.04.19)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN OVER COUNTER ON 03.04.19)

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 01:00 HOURS.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY TERESA SAMPLES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY TERESA SAMPLES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/06/2019
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED FULLY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT ORDERED ENTERED 03/25/19; JUDGMENT FOR: ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TERESA SAMPLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE: COMPLIANCE REVIEW; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; JOHN W BURDICK, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: MELISSA SIMENDICH; COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BOROS 13355; BAILIFF: S ANDREWS; PLAINTIFF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT PRESENT; BY KELLIE LORD; ATTORNEY HARLAN BRANSKY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: TERESA SAMPLES; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR COURT TRIAL.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; KELLIE LORD IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; COURT FINDS DEFENDANT IS NOT IN COMPLIANCE WITH THE STIPULATION OF THE PARTIES MARCH 4, 2019.; COURT PROCEEDS WITH DEFAULT PROVE UP HEARING.; PLAINTIFFS EXHIBITS 1,2,3 REFERRED AND ATTACHED TO THE COMPLAINT ARE IDENTIFIED AND ADMITTED.; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT ORDERED ENTERED 03/25/19; JUDGMENT FOR: ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT; JUDGMENT AGAINST: TERESA SAMPLES; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: TERESA SAMPLES, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $0.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $250.00 COSTS $345.00 AND DAMAGES $2,266.95.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,861.95; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); ACTION DISPO: JUDGMENT; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( GIVEN OVER COUNTER ON 03.04.19)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION RE: JUDGMENT (UNLAWFUL DETAINER) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • FILING FEE PAID BY ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT FOR WRIT FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 190304-0206 $25.00; 190304-0206-CK Reference Number 1699

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/04/2019
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 01:00 HRS.; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JOHN W BURDICK, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: MELISSA SIMENDICH; COURT REPORTER JENNIFER BOROS 13355; BAILIFF: S ANDREWS; KELLIE LORD, PROPERTY MANAGER; ATTORNEY HARLAN BRANSKY PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; DEFENDANT TERESA SAMPLES PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; ACTION CAME ON FOR COURT TRIAL.; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; STIP FOR APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS JUDGE PRO TEM FILED; (SIGNED BY PARTIES AND COUNSEL); KELLIE LORD IS SWORN.; TERESA SAMPLES IS SWORN.; STIPULATION REACHED. SEE STIPULATION ON FILE FOR PARTICULARS.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE: COMPLIANCE REVIEW SET FOR 03/25/19 AT 08:01 IN DEPARTMENT M4.; IF NO APPEARANCES CASE WILL BE DISMISSED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/11/2019
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON TERESA SAMPLES FOR ANSWER IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY TERESA SAMPLES; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • ON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 02/06/2019 OF ACCURATE MANGEMENTINVESTMENT, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 02/06/19 WITH FEES OF $45.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2019
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON TERESA SAMPLES; PARTY SERVED ON 02/06/19 (UD) WITH FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $45.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • FEE PAYMENT; Minutes; Receipt: 190206-0790 $255.00; 190206-0790-CK Reference Number 1690

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • ADA NOTICE SENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT M4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer HARLAN L BRANSKY