This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/11/2018 at 22:15:08 (UTC).

AARON VON BEAVOR

Case Summary

On 10/20/2017 AARON VON BEAVOR was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1093

  • Filing Date:

    10/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Criminal, Family Law, Traffic And Probate Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

ALBERT P. DIROCCO JR.

Decedent

AARON VON BEAVOR

Other

CONNIE VON BEAVOR

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

PETTLER AND MILLER

3465 Torrance Blvd Ste D

Torrance, CA 90503

Other Attorney

FORD WALKER HAGGERTY & BEHAR

One World Trade Center

Long Beach, CA 76652

 

Court Documents

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE SERVICE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED

DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE SERVICE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY MARIO LARA ORELLANA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $500,000.00.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY MARIO LARA ORELLANA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $500,000.00.

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ALBERT P. DIROCCO, JR APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ALBERT P. DIROCCO, JR APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY CONNIE VON BEAVOR FILED.

REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY CONNIE VON BEAVOR FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180103-0838 $40.00; 180103-0838-CK Reference Number 123145

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,103.84.

CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,103.84.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROBATE - LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIN FILED.

NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROBATE - LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIN FILED.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ALBERT P. DIROCCO JR.

DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ALBERT P. DIROCCO JR.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED.

PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/12/2018
  • HEARING RE: STATUS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/06/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2018
  • HRG OF 09/12/18 - PROBATE NOTES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DECLARATION OF ATTORNEY RE SERVICE OF CREDITORS CLAIM FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY MARIO LARA ORELLANA. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $500,000.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • ON THE PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED 10/20/2017 OF ALBERT DIROCCO, CONNIE VON BEAVOR IS ADDED AS A THIRD PARTY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • LETTERS ISSUED ( SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • CASE ADDED TO COURT SUPERVISION (PROBATE).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING SPECIAL ADMINISTRATOR, ALBERT P. DIROCCO, JR APPOINTED WITH -- IAEA. BOND NOT REQUIRED, B.M. GARVIN APPOINTED PROBATE REFEREE, FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR SPECIAL NOTICE BY CONNIE VON BEAVOR FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 180103-0838 $40.00; 180103-0838-CK Reference Number 123145

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/12/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CREDITORS CLAIM FILED BY CAPITAL ONE BANK (USA), N.A.. TOTAL AMOUNT OF CLAIM IS $2,103.84.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2017
  • EX PARTE HEARING RE: LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; STANFORD E. REICHERT, JUDGE; CLERK: TIFFANY KRETZMEIER; COURT REPORTER LINDY CASTRO 13180; COURT ATTENDANT D MORENO; APPEARANCES:; MARK MILLER APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR ALBERT P. DIROCCO JR..; CONNIE BEAVOR (WITH FRIEND, JOSEPH JONES) PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PROBATE HEARING HELD (OTHER); EX-PARTE HEARING IS HELD.; EX PARTE APPLICATION ARGUED.; CONNIE BEAVOR REQUESTS A CONTINUANCE TO OBTAIN LEGAL REPRESENTATION.; COURT GRANTS REQUEST FOR CONTINUANCE; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 01/03/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S35XP.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING ON PETITION FOR PROBATE - LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMIN FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • PROPOSED ORDER ON LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION RECEIVED. (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2017
  • PROPOSED LETTERS RECEIVED (CONFIDENTIAL)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S35P

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • CONFIDENTIAL STATEMENT OF BIRTH DATE AND DRIVER'S LICENSE NUMBER FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DUTIES AND LIABILITIES OF PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE FILED BY ALBERT P. DIROCCO JR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION FOR LETTERS OF SPECIAL ADMINISTRATION FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2017
  • PETITION AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED. (PROBATE); Minutes; Receipt: 171101-0066 $465.00; 171101-0066-CK Reference Number 2993

    Read MoreRead Less