This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 08/30/2018 at 14:01:07 (UTC).

AARON HORSLEY -V- JOSE MARTINEZ ET AL

Case Summary

On 07/21/2014 AARON HORSLEY filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against JOSE MARTINEZ. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0742

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

AARON HORSLEY

Defendants

JOSE MARTINEZ

AURORA MARTINEZ

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MAGALLANES, DAYTON

10540 Wilshire Blvd; Ste 417

Los Angeles, CA 90024

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/23/2015
  • HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF FILING FEE PAYMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • VACATE HRG HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 10/23/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2015
  • FILING FEE PAID BY JOSE MARTINEZ, AURORA MARTINEZ FOR PAYMENT ON 1ST APPEARANCE FEES; Minutes; Receipt: 151021-2164 $435.00; 151021-2164-CK Reference Number 2081

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2015
  • NOTICE OF RULING FILED BY AARON HORSLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:PLAINTIFFS PAYMNT OF COURT FEES; Disposition: Pre-D Complete; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: LUANN GEESINK; COURT REPORTER LINDA BALDWIN 12453; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY DAYTON MAGALLANES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AARON HORSLEY.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: JOSE MARTINEZ, AURORA MARTINEZ; PROCEEDINGS:; POST-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD; PLAINTIFF ADVISED THE COURT FEES MUST BE PAID WITHIN 60 DAYS. MATTER IS RESET AS STATED; BELOW.; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: RECEIPT OF FILING FEE PAYMENT SET FOR 10/23/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; NOTICE WAIVED.; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/28/2015
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2015
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.; Minutes; IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED THAT JUDGMENT SHALL BE ENTERED AS FOLLOWS:; JUDGMENT FOR: AARON HORSLEY; JUDGMENT AGAINST: JOSE MARTINEZ, AURORA MARTINEZ; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $1,333.33 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $1,050.00 COSTS $0.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,383.33; MATTER SETTLED AT 02/27/15 MEDIATION DATE; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF STIPULATED JUDGMENT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • MOTION RE: TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT * FILED BY PLAINTIFF AARON HORSLEY; Disposition: GRANTED; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; DAYTON MAGALLANES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AARON HORSLEY.; JOSE MARTINEZ PRESENT IN PRO PER.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MOTION; AARON HORSLEY'S MOTION TO ENFORCE SETTLEMENT IS HEARD.; NO OPPOSITION PRESENTED.; COURT FINDS:; AARON HORSLEY'S MOTION ENFORCE SETTLEMENT IS GRANTED.; JUDGMENT IS GRANTED IN FAVOR OF THE PLAINTIFF AARON HORSLEY IN THE PRINCIPLE AMOUNT OF; $1333.33 PLUS ATTORNEY FEES IN THE AMOUNT OF $1050.00 FOR A TOTAL OF $2,383.33.; PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL TO PREPARE AND SUBMIT THE JUDGMENT FOR SIGNATURE.; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE; DISMISSAL ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (UNLIMITED) FILED 07/21/2014 OF AARON HORSLEY IS ORDERED SET-ASIDE, THE CASE AND PARTIES ARE SET BACK TO ACTIVE STATUS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:PLAINTIFFS PAYMNT OF COURT FEES; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; COURT REPORTER DEBORAH THOMPSON 7079; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; DAYTON MAGALLANES APPEARS BY COURTCALL FOR AARON HORSLEY.; DEFENDANT JOSE MARTINEZ PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; COURT CONTINUES THIS HEARING AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; HEARING RE: OSC RE:RECEIPT OF JUDGMENT SET FOR 08/28/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 08/28/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; CORRESPONDENCE COVERSHEET GENERATED TO MAIL COPY OF MINUTE ORDER WITH NEW HEARING DATE TO COUNSEL OF RECORD.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2015
  • HEARING RE: OSC RE:PLAINTIFFS PAYMNT OF COURT FEES; Disposition: Continued; Minutes; JANET M FRANGIE, JUDGE; CLERK: THERESA HANDYSIDE; NOT REPORTED; COURT ATTENDANT D ZWIERLEIN; APPEARANCES:; NO APPEARANCE.; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; ON THE COURTS MOTION THIS HEARING IS CONTINUED AS FOLLOWS:; HEARINGS:; CURRENT HEARING CONTINUED TO 07/27/15 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S29.; NOTICE GIVEN BY JUDICIAL ASSISTANT; VIA TELECOM WITH PLAINTIFFS COUNSEL; COUNSEL FOR PLAINTIFF TO GIVE NOTICE.; ; ACTION - COMPLETE

    Read MoreRead Less
41 More Docket Entries
  • 07/23/2014
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY AARON HORSLEY IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/23/2014
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON AARON HORSLEY FOR COURT FEE IN THE AMOUNT OF $435.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY AARON HORSLEY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • PRAYED FOR AMOUNT AND/OR DAMAGES IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • PRAYER FOR INTEREST PERCENTAGE RATE OF 0.00 PER ANNUM BEGINNING DATE OF 07/21/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • COMPLAINT AND PARTY INFORMATION ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2014
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S29

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.