This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 06/29/2018 at 01:43:22 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL -V- MORENO

Case Summary

On 12/01/2016 A-L FINANCIAL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MORENO. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Barstow District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2517

  • Filing Date:

    12/01/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORP

Defendant

LOGAN R MORENO

 

Court Documents

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP FILED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP FILED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO LOGAN R MORENO. PARTY SERVED ON 12/15/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO LOGAN R MORENO. PARTY SERVED ON 12/15/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed

SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:50; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: L. DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; A-L FINANCIAL CORP REPRESENTED BY KARINA OROZCO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LOGAN R MORENO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; LOGAN R MORENO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LOGAN R MORENO.; JUDGMENT FOR: A-L FINANCIAL CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LOGAN R MORENO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $861.98 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $135.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $996.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP FILED. (IMAGED)

AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP FILED. (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1038.91 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1038.91 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170411-0204 $25.00

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.93), AND

MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.93), AND

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $73.63

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $73.63

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1012.00 ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1012.00 ) (IMAGED)

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1012.00 ) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY A-L FINANCIAL CORP FOR WRIT; Minutes; Receipt: 171221-0532 $25.00; 171221-0532-CK Reference Number 954284

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $73.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF CREDIT (IN THE AMOUNT OF $143.61) FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • MEMORANDUM OF COSTS (IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00) AFTERJUDGMENT, DECLARATION OF INTEREST (IN THE AMOUNT OF $16.93), AND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SACRAMENTO COUNTY ( 1038.91 ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170411-0204 $25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COVERSHEET GENERATED FOR NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO PARTIES ON 02/03/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP FILED. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SMALL CLAIMS HEARING; Disposition: Complaint Dispoed; Minutes; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 08:50; JAMES R BAXTER, COMMISSIONER; CLERK: AMANDA JAMES; BAILIFF: L. DILBECK; APPEARANCES:; A-L FINANCIAL CORP REPRESENTED BY KARINA OROZCO.; PARTIES NOT PRESENT: LOGAN R MORENO; PROCEEDINGS:; PRE-DISPOSITION HEARING HELD.; LOGAN R MORENO HAVING FAILED TO APPEAR, MATTER PROCEEDS AS A DEFAULT.; DEFAULT JUDGMENT ENTERED AGAINST LOGAN R MORENO.; JUDGMENT FOR: A-L FINANCIAL CORP; JUDGMENT AGAINST: LOGAN R MORENO; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $861.98 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $0.00 COSTS $135.00 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $996.98; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - UNCONTESTED (SC); ACTION - COMPLETE; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFFS CLAIM AND ORDER FILED AS TO LOGAN R MORENO. PARTY SERVED ON 12/15/16. TYPE OF SERVICE IS SUBSTITUTED/MAIL. WITH FEES OF $35.00. (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • NOTICE FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF A-L FINANCIAL CORP FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • FILING FEE PAID BY A-L FINANCIAL CORP FOR 1ST PAPER FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 161205-0208 $100.00; 161205-0208-CK Reference Number 933962

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • CLAIM OF PLAINTIFF (+12 FILINGS) (IMAGED)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • UPDATE DEFAULT DEPARTMENT TO B1

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where A-L FINANCIAL CORP is a litigant