This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/06/2018 at 07:02:17 (UTC).

A-L FINANCIAL -v- MALONE

Case Summary

On 09/27/2017 A-L FINANCIAL -v- MALONE was filed as a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********9004

  • Filing Date:

    09/27/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Bernardino District Courthouse Civil Division

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION

Defendant

VALENCIA MALONE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LINCOLN D GARDNER

2340 S. El Camino Real Suite 12

San Clemente, CA 92672

 

Court Documents

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

NOTICE IMAGED

NOTICE IMAGED

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

COMPLAINT FILED

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALENCIA MALONE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $73.95 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALENCIA MALONE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $73.95 FILED.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/27/2018
  • OSC RE: STATUS OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • FILING FEE PAID BY A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION FOR WRIT OF EXECUTION; Minutes; Receipt: 180525-0501 $25.00; 180525-0501-CK Reference Number 17569

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2018
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( 10357.72 )

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2018
  • JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION FILED; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION ORDERED ENTERED 05/15/18; JUDGMENT FOR: A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VALENCIA MALONE; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $8,309.19 INTEREST $728.67 ATTORNEY FEES $980.91 COSTS $313.95 AND DAMAGES $0.00.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $10,332.72; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DISMISSAL FILED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION AS TO DOES ONLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: CCP 1033 FILED BY A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON VALENCIA MALONE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2018
  • DEFAULT ENTERED ON COMPLAINT (LIMITED JURISDICTION) FILED 09/27/2017 OF A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION AS TO VALENCIA MALONE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2018
  • OSC RE: SERVICE COMPLETION PURSUANT TO CRC3.740; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • VACATE OSCSVC HEARING SCHEDULED FOR 03/28/18 AT 08:30 IN DEPARTMENT S17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP/PET ON VALENCIA MALONE; DEFENDANT/RESPONDENT SERVED ON 10/14/17 WITH COSTS OF $73.95 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF ASSIGNMENT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT S17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE IMAGED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • FILING FEE PAID BY A-L FINANCIAL CORPORATION FOR 1ST APPEARANCE FEE; Minutes; Receipt: 170927-0424 $240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less