Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/07/2018 at 18:53:31 (UTC).

2013-1 -v- URIBE

Case Summary

On 03/20/2017 2013-1 filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against URIBE. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana District Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1863

  • Filing Date:

    03/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    San Bernardino County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Fontana District Courthouse

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P.

Defendant

VICTOR URIBE

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HELAINE S. ASHTON

2040 Main Street Suite 500

Irvine, CA 92614

 

Court Documents

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170425-0151 $25.00; 170425-0151-CK Reference Number 532631

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:50 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment

COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:50 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SUSAN GREEK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; 2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P. REPRESENTED BY MONIQUE NIZNIK.; DEFENDANT VICTOR URIBE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:24; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PLAINTIFFS CASE IN CHIEF; MONIQUE NIZNIK IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; DEFENDANTS CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- VICTOR URIBE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT RESTS.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/20/2017 OF 2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P. ORDERED ENTERED 04/24/17; JUDGMENT FOR: 2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR URIBE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,410.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $365.00 AND DAMAGES $1,927.92.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,202.92; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VICTOR URIBE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

REQUEST FOR SETTING FILED; TRIAL ESTIMATE 00:50 HOURS.

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

COURT TRIAL SENT TO PARTIES

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

REQUEST TO ENTER DEFAULT AGAINST ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VICTOR URIBE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/22/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMP FILED ON VICTOR URIBE; PARTY SERVED ON %%X% (UD) WITH FEES IN THEAMOUNT OF 03/22/17

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 03/22/17 WITH FEES OF $55.00.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

ANSWER FILED BY VICTOR URIBE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

ANSWER FILED BY VICTOR URIBE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.

UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170320-0604 $255.00; 170320-0604-CK Reference Number 531630

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2017
  • STATUS CONFERENCE -- UNLAWFUL DETAINER; Disposition: VACATED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • LEVYING OFFICER NOTICE ON WRIT OF POSSESSION FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY FILED SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $145.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( ISSUED AT COUNTER); Minutes; Receipt: 170425-0151 $25.00; 170425-0151-CK Reference Number 532631

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • SIGNED JUDGMENT FILED WITH COURT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • COURT TRIAL SET - NOTICE SENT TO PARTIES. ESTIMATED TRIAL LENGTH 00:50 HRS.; Disposition: Action Dispo: Judgment; Minutes; LYNN PONCIN, JUDGE; CLERK: SHOSHONE NEAL; BAILIFF: M HOUSTON; APPEARANCES:; ATTORNEY SUSAN GREEK PRESENT FOR PLAINTIFF/PETITIONER.; 2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P. REPRESENTED BY MONIQUE NIZNIK.; DEFENDANT VICTOR URIBE PRESENT; PROCEEDINGS:; PREDISPOSITION HEARING HELD; MATTER ELECTRONICALLY RECORDED; 09:24; NO SETTLEMENT REACHED; COURT TRIAL PROCEEDS.; PLAINTIFFS CASE IN CHIEF; MONIQUE NIZNIK IS SWORN AND TESTIFIES AS WITNESS FOR PLAINTIFF.; PLAINTIFF RESTS.; DEFENDANTS CASE IN CHIEF; WITNESS -- VICTOR URIBE IS SWORN AND EXAMINED.; DEFENDANT RESTS.; DOCUMENT(S) SUBMITTED FOR REVIEW.; AND RETURNED; AFTER TESTIMONY AND DUE CONSIDERATION BY THE COURT :; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 03/20/2017 OF 2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P. ORDERED ENTERED 04/24/17; JUDGMENT FOR: 2013-1 IH BORROWERL.P.; JUDGMENT AGAINST: VICTOR URIBE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $2,410.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $365.00 AND DAMAGES $1,927.92.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $5,202.92; FORFEITURE OF RENTAL/LEASE AGREEMENT; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: VICTOR URIBE, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; WRIT TO ISSUE FORTHWITH.; JUDGMENT SIGNED.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - COURT FINDING AFTER COURT TRIAL (CIV); 09:28; CERTIFICATE OF ELECTRONIC RECORDING MONITOR PRINTED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DEFAULT IS RETURNED BY COURT FOR THE FOLLOWING REASON(S): UNKNOWNS WERE DEFAULTED ON 4/4/17.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2017
  • DEFAULT RECEIVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF RETURN OF DOCUMENT(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER GRANTED FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES AND COSTS FILED BY VICTOR URIBE IS GRA; Disposition: GRANTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • FILING FEE WAIVED ON VICTOR URIBE FOR FIRST APPEARANCE IN THE AMOUNT OF $240.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • REQUEST FOR WAIVER OF COURT FEES & COSTS FILED BY VICTOR URIBE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER FILED BY VICTOR URIBE; PARTY REPRESENTED BY PRO/PER.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • PAST DUE RENT IS $2,410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • DECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $80.33.--BEGINNING ON 04/01/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 170320-0604 $255.00; 170320-0604-CK Reference Number 531630

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2017
  • CASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer ASHTON, HELAINE S