This case was last updated from San Bernardino County Superior Courts on 09/05/2018 at 03:33:53 (UTC).

17010 MARYGOLD V REYNAGA

Case Summary

On 12/16/2016 17010 MARYGOLD filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against REYNAGA. This case was filed in San Bernardino County Superior Courts, Fontana Courthouse located in San Bernardino, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8863

  • Filing Date:

    12/16/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    San Bernardino, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

17010 MARYGOLD, LLC

Defendants

ISRAEL RUBI

RENAN REYNAGA

MARIA REYNAGA

Other

ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST. JOHN, LLP

7676 Hazard Center Dr Ste 900C

San Diego, CA 92108

 

Court Documents

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

WRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,782.99 FILED. (IMAGED)

DECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,782.99 FILED. (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.21 (IMAGED)

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.21 (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE ) (IMAGED)

WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0300 $25.00; 170718-0300-CK Reference Number 312856

HELAINE S ASHTON IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC, AND KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST. JOHN, LLP IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

HELAINE S ASHTON IS REMOVED AS ATTORNEY FOR 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC, AND KIMBALL, TIREY, & ST. JOHN, LLP IS ADDED AS ATTORNEY OF RECORD.

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $48.16

COST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $0.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $48.16

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.

MONEY JUDGMENT AFTER 585 DECLARATION FILED.; Minutes; 585 DECLARATION: MONEY JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/16/2016 OF 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC GRANTED BY COURT.; JUDGMENT FOR: 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA REYNAGA, RENAN REYNAGA, ISRAEL RUBI; JUDGMENT IN THE AMOUNT OF: PRINCIPAL $701.00 INTEREST $0.00 ATTORNEY FEES $500.00 COSTS $480.00 AND DAMAGES $436.60.; JUDGMENT TOTAL IS: $2,117.60; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY 0F JUDGMENT DEFAULT BY COURT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

DECLARATION OF LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

DECLARATION OF LOST OR OTHERWISE UNAVAILABLE RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED. REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585(B), (C) FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

DECLARATION RE: REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT UNDER CCP 585D FILED.

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN)

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED FOR SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( PLACED IN SHERIFFS BIN); Minutes; Receipt: 170110-0496 $25.00; 170110-0496-CK Reference Number 528842

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION PURSUANT TO CCP712.010 FILED.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

APPLICATION FOR JUDGMENT FOR RESTITUTION OF PREMISES ONLY, PURS. TO C.C.P. 1169.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIA REYNAGA, RENAN REYNAGA, ISRAEL RUBI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT AND REQUEST FOR CLERK'S/COURT JUDGMENT FILED ON MARIA REYNAGA, RENAN REYNAGA, ISRAEL RUBI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.

CLERK'S JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ENTERED.; Minutes; JUDGMENT ON UD COMPLAINT < $10,000 FILED 12/16/2016 OF 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC ORDERED ENTERED 01/09/17; JUDGMENT FOR: 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC; JUDGMENT AGAINST: MARIA REYNAGA, RENAN REYNAGA, ISRAEL RUBI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS; JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION ON PARTY: MARIA REYNAGA, RENAN REYNAGA, ISRAEL RUBI, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS. COURT ORDERS RESTITUTION OF PREMISES.; STAGE AT DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); DISPOSITION: ENTRY OF JUDGMENT - CLERK DEFAULT BEFORE TRIAL (CIV); ACTION - COMPLETE

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ISRAEL RUBI SERVED ON 12/18/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ISRAEL RUBI SERVED ON 12/18/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/18/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

PROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/18/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketJUDGMENT STATUS IS NOW SATISFIED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED FULLY SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketSATISFACTION RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED PARTIALLY SATISFIED IN THE AMOUNT OF $2,301.27.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT RETURNED FROM SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY UNSATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $0.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/04/2018
  • DocketACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED PARTIALLY SATISFIED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • DocketCOST BILL RECEIVED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: CREDITS IN THE AMOUNT OF $1,782.99 FILED. (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/16/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCOST BILL AFTER JUDGMENT FILED WITH COSTS IN THE AMOUNT OF $60.00 AND INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $1.21 (IMAGED)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/18/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketWRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO SAN BERNARDINO COUNTY ( MAILED BACK IN SASE ) (IMAGED); Minutes; Receipt: 170718-0300 $25.00; 170718-0300-CK Reference Number 312856

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO ISRAEL RUBI SERVED ON 12/18/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • DocketON THE UD COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED 12/16/2016 OF 17010 MARYGOLD, LLC, ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS IS ADDED AS A DEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF PRE JUDGMENT CLAIM; SERVED AS TO ALL UNKNOWN OCCUPANTS ON 12/18/16 WITH FEES OF $50.00.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO MARIA REYNAGA SERVED ON 12/18/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/09/2017
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF SUB-SERVICE AS TO RENAN REYNAGA SERVED ON 12/18/16 WITH COSTS OF $50.00 FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketCASE ASSIGNED FOR ALL PURPOSES TO DEPARTMENT F7

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL CASE COVER SHEET FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketPAST DUE RENT IS $701.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • DocketDECLARATION OF DAILY RENTAL VALUE FILED -- DAILY RENTAL VALUE IS $43.66.--BEGINNING ON 01/01/17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/16/2016
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketUNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT <$10,000 FILED. SUMMONS ISSUED AND FILED.; Minutes; Receipt: 161216-0583 $255.00; 161216-0583-CK Reference Number 528019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less