This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 04/28/2023 at 11:53:20 (UTC).

Zeffrum Nathaniel vs. FCA US, LLC

Case Summary

On 02/09/2023 Zeffrum Nathaniel filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against FCA US, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4474

  • Filing Date:

    02/09/2023

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Nathaniel, Zeffrum

Defendants

Does 1-10

FCA US, LLC

Folsom Lake Chrysler Dodge Jeep Ram

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Tionna Dolin

Defendant Attorney

Spencer P Hugret

 

Court Documents

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2023
  • HearingEvent Type: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program; Department: 43; Status: Scheduled

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/20/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: FCA US, LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Nathaniel, Zeffrum(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Nathaniel, Zeffrum(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Nathaniel, Zeffrum(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 12/22/2023 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 43 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Case Management Conference and Order to Appear has been generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 02/10/2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Nathaniel, Zeffrum(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2023
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Nathaniel, Zeffrum(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less