This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 06:36:51 (UTC).

Yariah Littlejohn vs. Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 Yariah Littlejohn filed a Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice lawsuit against Kaiser Foundation Hospitals. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********0985

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Medical Malpractice

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Littlejohn, Yariah

Defendants

Does 1-300

Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc

Kaiser Foundation Hospitals

The Permanente Medical Group Inc

Guardian Ad Litem

Littlejohn, Aisha

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Thomas E Donahue

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff))

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Submitting Claims to Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action) submitted by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; The Permanente Medical Group Inc; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals rejected on 01/31/2022

Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Submitting Claims to Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action) submitted by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; The Permanente Medical Group Inc; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals rejected on 01/31/2022

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Stipulation and Proposed Order - Other (Submitting Claims to Binding Arbitration and Stay of Action) submitted by Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc; The Permanente Medical Group Inc; Kaiser Foundation Hospitals rejected on 01/31/2022; Filed By: Kaiser Foundation Health Plan Inc(Defendant); Kaiser Foundation Hospitals(Guardian Ad Litem); The Permanente Medical Group Inc(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Littlejohn, Aisha added as a Guardian Ad Litem effective 11/12/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 38

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Littlejohn, Yariah(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Permanente Medical Group is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HOSPITALS is a litigant

Latest cases where KAISER FOUNDATION HEALTH PLAN INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer DONAHUE, THOMAS E.