This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 01/06/2023 at 20:11:13 (UTC).

Workforce Defense League vs. Clayco, Inc.

Case Summary

On 01/31/2022 Workforce Defense League filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Clayco, Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********4822

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2022

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Workforce Defense League

Defendants

Clayco, Inc.

United Contractor Services LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Andrea Matsuoka

Defendant Attorney

Michael J. Nader

 

Court Documents

Complaint filed

Complaint filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

Summons submitted by Workforce Defense League rejected on 02/01/2022

Summons submitted by Workforce Defense League rejected on 02/01/2022

Summons filed

Summons filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed

Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/10/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/24/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Nader, Michael J. added as a effective 03/18/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Removal to Federal Court filed; Filed By: Clayco, Inc.(Defendant); United Contractor Services LLC(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons submitted by Workforce Defense League rejected on 02/01/2022; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less