This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 05/26/2022 at 12:26:41 (UTC).

Workforce Defense League vs. Brown Construction Inc

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 Workforce Defense League filed a Labor - Other Labor lawsuit against Brown Construction Inc. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********3749

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Labor - Other Labor

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Workforce Defense League

Defendants

Brown Construction Inc

RJP Employee Leasing LLC

RJP Framing Inc

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Matthew J Gauger

Defendant Attorneys

Paul V Simpson

Lisa V Ryan

 

Court Documents

Case Management Statement filed

Case Management Statement filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Request for Dismissal filed

Correspondence (Return Mail) filed

Correspondence (Return Mail) filed

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

Summons filed

Summons filed

Summons (to First Amended Complaint) submitted by Workforce Defense League rejected on 12/10/2021

Summons (to First Amended Complaint) submitted by Workforce Defense League rejected on 12/10/2021

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Amended Complaint (First) filed

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

Order Determining Disposition of Ex Parte Application filed

Ex Parte Application - Other (For leave to file amended complaint) filed

Ex Parte Application - Other (For leave to file amended complaint) filed

Answer (To Complaint) filed

Answer (To Complaint) filed

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed. (Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff))

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff))

Answer filed.

Answer filed. (Filed By: Brown Construction Inc(Defendant))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed.

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed. (Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff))

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Statement filed; Filed By: RJP Employee Leasing LLC(Defendant); RJP Framing Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case Management Conference - Case Management Program scheduled for 04/15/2022 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 38 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse was vacated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Amended Complaint disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Correspondence (Return Mail) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case disposed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Case dismissed with disposition of Request for Dismissal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request for Dismissal filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Clerk's Certificate of Service By Mail (out of process) generated

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Scheduling of Case Management Conference) filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Substitute filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 08/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (To Complaint) filed; Filed By: RJP Employee Leasing LLC(Defendant); RJP Framing Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: Brown Construction Inc(Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/01/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: This case is reassigned from department 43 to department 38 for Case Management Program

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 43

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Workforce Defense League(Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less