This case was last updated from Not Yet Classified on 07/17/2023 at 15:17:36 (UTC).

Wayde James vs. Brandon James Condie

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 Wayde James filed a Not Yet Classified lawsuit against Brandon James Condie. This case was filed in Not Yet Classified, Not Yet Classified. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    **********************-GDS

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Not Yet Classified

  • Courthouse:

    Not Yet Classified

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

James, Kathleen

James, Wayde

Defendant

Condie, Brandon James

 

Court Documents

Notice of Hearing

08/24/2022; Notice of Hearing

Notice of Hearing

08/24/2022; Notice of Hearing

Minute Order

06/06/2022; Minute Order

Tentative Ruling

05/23/2022; Tentative Ruling

Mediation Statement

05/18/2022; Mediation Statement

Case Management Statement

05/18/2022; Case Management Statement

Mediation Statement

05/17/2022; Mediation Statement

Case Management Statement

05/17/2022; Case Management Statement

Certificate of Mailing for

04/05/2022; Certificate of Mailing for

Order Scheduling of Case Management Conference

04/05/2022; Order Scheduling of Case Management Conference

Answer

12/17/2021; Answer

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2021; Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons

10/28/2021; Summons

Order Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference

10/26/2021; Order Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference

Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2021; Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

10/26/2021; Complaint

10 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

10/10/2022

DocketMessage: Case reassigned to 43 effective 10/10/2022 .; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

HearingMessage: Civil Settlement Conference - Civil Settlement Conference scheduled for 04/24/2024 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 59 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the No Forms has been generated .; Category: Scheduling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

HearingMessage: Civil Trial Assignment - Long Cause - Civil Trial Assignment scheduled for 06/11/2024 at 08:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse and the Notice of Hearing has been generated .; Category: Scheduling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketName: Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022
View Court Documents

DocketName: Notice of Hearing

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2022

DocketMessage: Notice of Hearing of Settlement Conference generated .; Category: Form

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/06/2022
View Court Documents

DocketName: Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

HearingMessage: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date within 60 days of the referral date.; Category: Scheduling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketMessage: Minutes finalized for Case Management Conference - Case Management Program heard on 06/03/2022 08:30:00 AM .; Category: Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/03/2022

DocketMessage: Case Referred to Trial Setting process for parties' selection of Trial date and Mandatory Settlement Conference date no later than 60 days after the effective date.; Category: Minute Order

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
21 More Docket Entries
10/28/2021

DocketName: RECEIPT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketMessage: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 10/28/2021 .; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/28/2021

DocketMessage: Summons filed. Filed By: James, Wayde (Plaintiff); James, Kathleen (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketName: Order Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketName: Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed By: James, Wayde (Plaintiff); James, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021
View Court Documents

DocketName: Complaint; Filed By: James, Wayde (Plaintiff); James, Kathleen (Plaintiff)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketMessage: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. Filed By: James, Wayde (Plaintiff); James, Kathleen (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketMessage: Complaint filed. Filed By: James, Wayde (Plaintiff); James, Kathleen (Plaintiff); Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketMessage: Case assigned to Department 31 .; Category: Case

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/26/2021

DocketMessage: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.; Category: Document

[+] Read More [-] Read Less