This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/19/2022 at 16:52:16 (UTC).

Valyncia Burton vs. MJA Holdings, LLC

Case Summary

On 12/07/2021 Valyncia Burton filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against MJA Holdings, LLC. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********2316

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Burton, Valyncia

Defendants

Does 1-50

MJA Holdings, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Chandra Gehri Spencer

Defendant Attorney

David A Melton

 

Court Documents

Summons filed.

Summons filed. (Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff))

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff))

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed.

Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed. (Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff))

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed

Answer filed

Answer filed

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer filed; Filed By: MJA Holdings, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Proof of Service of 30-day Summons & Complaint - Personal filed; Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Jury Fee Deposit filed; Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons for 30-Day Summons was issued during case initiation on 12/08/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial CMC) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Burton, Valyncia(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MJA HOLDINGS INC. DBA ONESTOP is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer David A. Melton