This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 12/12/2019 at 13:00:44 (UTC).

Valeiy Kesov vs. The California Department of Real Estate

Case Summary

On 11/14/2019 Valeiy Kesov filed an Other lawsuit against The California Department of Real Estate. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8939

  • Filing Date:

    11/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Sacramento County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kesov, Valeiy

Respondents

Does 1-10

The California Department of Real Estate

 

Court Documents

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (and Verified Application for an Order Directing Payment Out of the Consumer Recovery Account Pursuant to Ca Bus & Prof Code 10472) filed.

Petition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (and Verified Application for an Order Directing Payment Out of the Consumer Recovery Account Pursuant to Ca Bus & Prof Code 10472) filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

Declaration - Other (of Service) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Service) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed.

Order on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

Motion to Dismiss (Petitioners Application for an Order) filed.

Motion to Dismiss (Petitioners Application for an Order) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

Declaration - Other (of Angela L Cash in Support of Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Angela L Cash in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

First Paper - Other (Answer to Appliction for Order Directing Payment out of the Consumer Recovery Account) filed.

First Paper - Other (Answer to Appliction for Order Directing Payment out of the Consumer Recovery Account) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

Proof of Service - MAILING filed.

Proof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion) filed.

Request - Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed.

Memorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

Declaration - Other (of Molly K Mosley in Support of Motion) filed.

Declaration - Other (of Molly K Mosley in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFirst Paper - Other (Answer to Appliction for Order Directing Payment out of the Consumer Recovery Account) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss - Civil Law and Motion scheduled for 02/03/2020 at 02:00:00 PM in Department 53 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Service) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRequest - Judicial Notice (in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Molly K Mosley in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDeclaration - Other (of Angela L Cash in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMemorandum of Points and Authorities (in Support of Motion) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMotion to Dismiss (Petitioners Application for an Order) filed. (Filed By: The California Department of Real Estate(Respondent))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketKesov, Valeiy Application for Waiver granted in full on 11/14/2019 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketProof of Service - MAILING filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Department 53 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (FW-003) filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPetition-Other (Civil Unlimited) (and Verified Application for an Order Directing Payment Out of the Consumer Recovery Account Pursuant to Ca Bus & Prof Code 10472) filed. (Filed By: Kesov, Valeiy(Petitioner))

    Read MoreRead Less