This case was last updated from Sacramento County Superior Courts on 03/15/2022 at 12:02:21 (UTC).

Vakhtang Panov vs. Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Vakhtang Panov filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Bryte Avenue Associates, L P. This case was filed in Sacramento County Superior Courts, Gordon D Schaber Sacramento County Courthouse located in Sacramento, California. The case status is Not Classified By Court.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *********8316

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Not Classified By Court

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Sacramento, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Panova, Arina

Panova, Layla

Panov, Vakhtang

Panova, Tatyana

Defendants

Lisenby, Dan

Does 1-25

Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.

Community Resident Services, Inc.

Aperto Property Management, Inc.

Hartwick, John

Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC

Doldier, Oksana

Ruiz, Gabriela

US Residential Group, LLC

Guardian Ad Litem

Postnikov, Roman

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Cheryl D Bossio

Defendant Attorney

Joann MO Rangel

 

Court Documents

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion set on 11/19/2021 09:30:00 AM published

Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion set on 11/19/2021 09:30:00 AM published

34-2021-00298316-CU-PO-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2019-00259962-CU-PO-GDS on 12/01/2021

34-2021-00298316-CU-PO-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2019-00259962-CU-PO-GDS on 12/01/2021

Minutes finalized for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion heard on 11/19/2021 09:30:00 AM

Minutes finalized for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion heard on 11/19/2021 09:30:00 AM

Reply (Brief To Defendants' Opposition To Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To CCP Section 36(B)) filed

Reply (Brief To Defendants' Opposition To Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To CCP Section 36(B)) filed

Opposition (To Plaintiffs' Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To CCP Section 36(b)) filed

Opposition (To Plaintiffs' Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To CCP Section 36(b)) filed

Notice of Motion (To Consolidate Cases) filed

Notice of Motion (To Consolidate Cases) filed

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Motion For Preference) filed

Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Motion For Preference) filed

Motion for Preference filed

Motion for Preference filed

Notice - Other (Of Posting Jury Fees) filed

Notice - Other (Of Posting Jury Fees) filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Notice and Acknowledgment of Receipt filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Notice of Related Case filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer (to Complaint) filed

Answer (To Complaint) submitted by Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.; Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC; Community Resident Services, Inc.; Aperto Property Management, Inc.; US Residential Group, LLC; Lisenby, Dan; Hartwick, John; Ruiz, Gabriela; Doldier,

Answer (To Complaint) submitted by Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.; Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC; Community Resident Services, Inc.; Aperto Property Management, Inc.; US Residential Group, LLC; Lisenby, Dan; Hartwick, John; Ruiz, Gabriela; Doldier, Oksana rejected on 07/08/2021

Complaint filed.

Complaint filed. (Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff); Panova, Arina(Plaintiff); Panova, Layla(Plaintiff); Panova, Tatyana(Plaintiff))

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed.

Civil Case Cover Sheet filed. (Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff); Panova, Arina(Plaintiff); Panova, Layla(Plaintiff); Panova, Tatyana(Plaintiff))

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed. (Filed By: Panova, Layla(Plaintiff))

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed.

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: 34-2021-00298316-CU-PO-GDS consolidated with lead case 34-2019-00259962-CU-PO-GDS on 12/01/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketPast Hearings; Event Time: 9:30 AM; Event Type: Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion; Department: 47; Status: Heard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Minutes finalized for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion heard on 11/19/2021 09:30:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Tentative Ruling for Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion set on 11/19/2021 09:30:00 AM published

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Reply (Brief To Defendants' Opposition To Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To CCP Section 36(B)) filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Opposition (To Plaintiffs' Motion For Trial Preference Pursuant To CCP Section 36(b)) filed; Filed By: Aperto Property Management, Inc.(Defendant); Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.(Defendant); Community Resident Services, Inc.(Defendant); Doldier, Oksana(Defendant); Hartwick, John(Defendant); Lisenby, Dan(Defendant); Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC(Defendant); Ruiz, Gabriela(Defendant); US Residential Group, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion for Preference - PJ Law & Motion scheduled for 11/19/2021 at 09:30:00 AM in Department 47 at Gordon D Schaber Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Notice of Motion (To Consolidate Cases) filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Request - Judicial Notice (ISO Motion For Preference) filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Motion for Preference filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 07/12/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (to Complaint) filed; Filed By: Aperto Property Management, Inc.(Defendant); Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.(Defendant); Community Resident Services, Inc.(Defendant); Doldier, Oksana(Defendant); Hartwick, John(Defendant); Lisenby, Dan(Defendant); Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC(Defendant); Ruiz, Gabriela(Defendant); US Residential Group, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Answer (To Complaint) submitted by Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.; Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC; Community Resident Services, Inc.; Aperto Property Management, Inc.; US Residential Group, LLC; Lisenby, Dan; Hartwick, John; Ruiz, Gabriela; Doldier, Oksana rejected on 07/08/2021; Filed By: Aperto Property Management, Inc.(Defendant); Bryte Avenue Associates, L.P.(Defendant); Community Resident Services, Inc.(Defendant); Doldier, Oksana(Defendant); Hartwick, John(Defendant); Lisenby, Dan(Defendant); Pap Bryte Avenue Associates, LLC(Defendant); Ruiz, Gabriela(Defendant); US Residential Group, LLC(Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Summons filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff); Panova, Arina(Plaintiff); Panova, Layla(Plaintiff); Panova, Tatyana(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order Appointing Guardian Ad Litem filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Postnikov, Roman added as a Guardian Ad Litem CR effective 04/15/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem filed; Filed By: Panova, Layla(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketROA Entry: Case assigned to Department 31

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Order - Other (Delay in Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference) filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Civil Case Cover Sheet filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff); Panova, Arina(Plaintiff); Panova, Layla(Plaintiff); Panova, Tatyana(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketROA Entry: Complaint filed; Filed By: Panov, Vakhtang(Plaintiff); Panova, Arina(Plaintiff); Panova, Layla(Plaintiff); Panova, Tatyana(Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Community Resident Services Inc is a litigant

Latest cases where APERTO PROPERTY MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where U S RESIDENTIAL GROUP LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant